Gonzales v. Dart et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Gonzales
Defendant: Thomas Dart and Cook County, Illinois
Case Number: 1:2018cv08078
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Minute order #10 is corrected: Defendant's agreed motion for extension of time until February 7, 2019 to answer #8 is granted. The status hearing set for 2/5/19 is reset to 2/19/19 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 11, 2019 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendant's agreed motion for extension of time until November 7, 2019 to answer #8 is granted. The status hearing set for 2/5/19 is reset to 2/19/19 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 10, 2019 9 NOTICE of Motion by Oscar Stephane Kpota for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/17/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kpota, Oscar)
January 10, 2019 8 MOTION by Defendant Thomas Dart for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Kpota, Oscar)
December 19, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Thomas Dart by Oscar Stephane Kpota (Kpota, Oscar)
December 12, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 2/5/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file an initial status report as set forth in the Judge's standing order four business days prior to the status hearing.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 11, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Gonzales as to All Defendants. (Morrissey, Patrick)
December 10, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas Dart (lma, )
December 10, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
December 7, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Daniel Gonzales by Thomas Gerard Morrissey (Morrissey, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Morrissey, Patrick)
December 7, 2018 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Daniel Gonzales by Patrick William Morrissey (Morrissey, Patrick)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Gonzales; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15257552.(Morrissey, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gonzales
Represented By: Patrick William Morrissey
Represented By: Thomas Gerard Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dart
Represented By: Oscar Stephane Kpota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?