Mitchell v. LCSA Contra Costa County Dept of Child Support Customer Service
Plaintiff: Clarence H. Mitchell
Defendant: LCSA Contra Costa County Dept of Child Support Customer Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv08131
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: This case was dismissed on December 18, 2018. Mr. Mitchell's amended complaint, and his motion for attorney representation and for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [10, 11, 12] are stricken without prejudice to appeal rights. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/9/2019. Mailed notice (smm, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Clarence H. Mitchell for attorney representation (ek, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Clarence H. Mitchell for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ek, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIVED AMENDED Complaint and no copies by Clarence H. Mitchell (Exhibit) (ek, )
December 18, 2018 MAILED a copy of the court's orders in that earlier case [8, 12 in Docket No. 18 C 7356] to Plaintiff. (kp, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is dismissed for the same reasons set forth in the court's order dismissing Mr. Mitchell's previous complaint. The Clerk is directed to send Mr. Mitchell a copy of the court's orders in that earlier case [8, 12 in Docket No. 18 C 7356]. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and for attorney representation [ #4 , #5 ] in this case are stricken. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/18/2018. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Clarence H. Mitchell for attorney representation. (nsf, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Clarence H. Mitchell for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (nsf, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Clarence H. Mitchell. (nsf, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (nsf, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 1 copy by Clarence H. Mitchell. (Exhibits) (nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. LCSA Contra Costa County Dept of Child Support Customer Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence H. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCSA Contra Costa County Dept of Child Support Customer Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?