Golbert et al v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Sterling B., Tyrese B., Issac D., Burl F., Archie C., Charles Golbert, Skylar L., Carrion C., Careale C., Charlie W., Stephen W., Jamya B., Alana M., Joshua F., Erica C. and Johnnise W.
Defendant: Jane Gantner, Sari Rowitz, Theresa Matthews, Angela Hassell, Linda Stroud, Marshae Terry, Tonya Mays-Harrington, Beverly J Walker, Arthur Bishop, Michael C. Jones, Erwin McEwen, Felicia Guest, Estate of George Sheldon, Cynthia Tate, Jill Tichenor, Juliana Harms, Lauren Williams, D. Jean Ortega-Piron, Larry Small, Debora Dyer-Webster, Bobbie Gregg, Janet Ahern, Estate of Richard H. Calica, Donna Steele and Illinois Department of Children and Family Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv08176
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Janet Ahern waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Jane Gantner waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Theresa Matthews waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Sari Rowitz waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Michael C. Jones waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Marshae Terry waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Linda Stroud waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Lauren Williams waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Larry Small waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Jill Tichenor waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Juliana Harms waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Debora Dyer-Webster waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Donna Steele waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Cynthia Tate waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Beverly J Walker waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charles Golbert. Angela Hassell waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Golbert as to Erwin McEwen on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 9, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Unopposed motion for extension of time until March 4, 2019 to answer #17 is granted. The status hearing set for 2/12/19 is reset to 3/7/19 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Barbara Lynn Greenspan for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #17 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Greenspan, Barbara)
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Illinois Department of Children and Family Services for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Unopposed Motion) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Greenspan, Barbara)
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Illinois Department of Children and Family Services by Barbara Lynn Greenspan (Greenspan, Barbara)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Golbert as to Bobbie Gregg on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Golbert as to D. Jean Ortega-Piron on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Goodwin, Julie)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Golbert as to Illinois Department of Children and Family Services on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Ainsworth, Russell)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 2/12/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Crosley, Adair)
December 17, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Illinois Department of Children and Family Services (jjr, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
December 14, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Janet Ahern, Arthur Bishop, Debora Dyer-Webster, Estate of George Sheldon, Estate of Richard H. Calica, Jane Gantner, Bobbie Gregg, Felicia Guest, Juliana Harms, Angela Hassell, Michael C. Jones, Theresa Matthews, Tonya Mays-Harrington, Erwin McEwen, D. Jean Ortega-Piron, Sari Rowitz, Larry Small, Donna Steele, Linda Stroud, Cynthia Tate, Marshae Terry, Jill Tichenor, Beverly J Walker, Lauren Williams (jjr, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sterling B., Tyrese B., Archie C., Issac D., Burl F., Charles Golbert, Skylar L. by Michael I Kanovitz (Kanovitz, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sterling B., Tyrese B., Archie C., Issac D., Burl F., Charles Golbert, Skylar L. by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sterling B., Tyrese B., Archie C., Issac D., Burl F., Charles Golbert, Skylar L. by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sterling B., Tyrese B., Archie C., Issac D., Burl F., Charles Golbert, Skylar L. by Julie Marie Goodwin (Goodwin, Julie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sterling B., Tyrese B., Archie C., Issac D., Burl F., Charles Golbert, Skylar L. by Adair Rachel Crosley (Crosley, Adair)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sterling B., Tyrese B., Archie C., Issac D., Burl F., Charles Golbert, Skylar L. by Russell R Ainsworth (Ainsworth, Russell)
December 13, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Justice filed by Tyrese B., Skylar L., Charles Golbert, Sterling B., Issac D., Archie C., Burl F.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15273046. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ainsworth, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golbert et al v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Gantner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sari Rowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Hassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshae Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Mays-Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly J Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erwin McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of George Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Tichenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliana Harms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Jean Ortega-Piron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debora Dyer-Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Gregg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Richard H. Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Children and Family Services
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling B.
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Adair Rachel Crosley
Represented By: Julie Marie Goodwin
Represented By: Russell R Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrese B.
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Adair Rachel Crosley
Represented By: Julie Marie Goodwin
Represented By: Russell R Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issac D.
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Adair Rachel Crosley
Represented By: Julie Marie Goodwin
Represented By: Russell R Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burl F.
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Adair Rachel Crosley
Represented By: Julie Marie Goodwin
Represented By: Russell R Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie C.
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Adair Rachel Crosley
Represented By: Julie Marie Goodwin
Represented By: Russell R Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Golbert
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Adair Rachel Crosley
Represented By: Julie Marie Goodwin
Represented By: Russell R Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skylar L.
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Adair Rachel Crosley
Represented By: Julie Marie Goodwin
Represented By: Russell R Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrion C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Careale C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamya B.
Represented By: Russell R Ainsworth
Represented By: Julie Marie Goodwin
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Adair Rachel Crosley
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnise W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?