Kowalski v. Layng

Appellee: Patrick S. Layng
Appellant: Robert M. Kowalski
Trustee: Chapter 7 Trustee, Gus A. Paloian
Case Number: 1:2018cv08209
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 APPELLEE'S Brief by Chapter 7 Trustee, Gus A. Paloian (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Sinha, Devvrat)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Devvrat Vikram Sinha for presentment of motion to dismiss #12 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Sinha, Devvrat)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Trustee Chapter 7 Trustee, Gus A. Paloian to dismiss Appeal for Debor's Failure to Provide Trial Transcripts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Sinha, Devvrat)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF In Support of Motion to stay conversion of case from Chapter 11 to chapter 7 by Robert M. Kowalski. (Exhibits) (nsf, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Appellant's motion to stay conversion of case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 #7 is denied. The modifies the schedule for briefing of this bankruptcy appeal as follows: Appellant shall serve and file his opening brief by 1/22/2019; Appellee shall respond by 2/5/2019; Appellant may reply by 2/12/2019. Status hearing set for 3/19/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant/Appellee Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Transmittal Letter ROA, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Kowalski for presentment of motion to stay #7 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 1/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. (ek, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Appellant Robert M. Kowalski to stay conversion of case from chapter 11 to chapter 7. (ek, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018, the appellant shall serve and file the opening brief by 1/14/2019. The appellee shall serve and file the response brief by 2/13/2019. The appellant may serve and file a reply brief by 2/27/2019. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Trustee Chapter 7 Trustee, Gus A. Paloian by Devvrat Vikram Sinha (Sinha, Devvrat)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Trustee Chapter 7 Trustee, Gus A. Paloian by Gus Anthony Paloian (Paloian, Gus)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Trustee Chapter 7 Trustee, Gus A. Paloian by James B. Sowka (Sowka, James)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Notice by Patrick S. Layng of Non-Participation (Gulden, Cameron)
December 14, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 9130 (Judge Cox) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter NOA, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kowalski v. Layng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patrick S. Layng
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert M. Kowalski
Represented By: Ernesto Dos Reis Borges, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Chapter 7 Trustee, Gus A. Paloian
Represented By: James B. Sowka
Represented By: Gus Anthony Paloian
Represented By: Devvrat Vikram Sinha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?