Sharon Renee Lloyd Foreign Grantor Trust v. Eng et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Renee Lloyd Foreign Grantor Trust
Defendant: Hedi Eng, United States Post Office, Sergeant Madden, Dion Bass, Chicago Police Department and Tiffany Eng
Case Number: 1:2018cv08253
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court dismisses the plaintiff's complaint sua sponte for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and failure to state a claim. The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #6 is denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/8/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 8, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ym, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 2/5/2019. The Court takes the matter under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #6 on 1/22/2019. The Court will need time to review the case. The motion is entered and continued to 2/5/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Sharon Renee Lloyd Foreign Grantor Trust. (nsf, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing on Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #6 is set for 1/22/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (sm, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Sharon Renee Lloyd Foreign Grantor Trust for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (las, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Sharon Renee Lloyd Foreign Grantor Trust (las, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (las, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 6 copies by Sharon Renee Lloyd Foreign Grantor Trust(Exhibits consist of two cd) (las, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharon Renee Lloyd Foreign Grantor Trust v. Eng et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hedi Eng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Post Office
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dion Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Eng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Renee Lloyd Foreign Grantor Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?