Dupree et al v. Village of Bellwood et al
Plaintiff: Cletter Dupree, Robin McDaniels, on behalf of herself and as Mother and Next Friend of S.B. and L.M., Tisha Dupree, Anthony Mines, Xavier Dupree, as Father and Next Friend of X.D., A.D., and A.R., Wanda Dupree, Robin McDaniels and Xavier Dupree
Defendant: Trevarthen, Woods-Ortiz, Johnson, Other Unknown Officers, Village of Bellwood and Michelli
Case Number: 1:2018cv08304
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendants Johnson, Michelli, Other Unknown Officers, Trevarthen, Village of Bellwood, Woods-Ortiz. (Raines, Shawnte)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Johnson, Michelli, Other Unknown Officers, Trevarthen, Village of Bellwood, Woods-Ortiz(Raines, Shawnte)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Johnson, Michelli, Trevarthen, Village of Bellwood, Woods-Ortiz by Emanuel C. Welch (Welch, Emanuel)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Without objection, defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 2/12/19 #8 is granted. Status hearing set for 2/12/19 is reset for 3/27/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Shawnte Miaundra Raines for presentment of extension of time #8 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/22/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Raines, Shawnte)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Johnson, Michelli, Trevarthen, Village of Bellwood, Woods-Ortiz for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Raines, Shawnte)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Johnson, Michelli, Other Unknown Officers, Trevarthen, Village of Bellwood, Woods-Ortiz by Shawnte Miaundra Raines (Raines, Shawnte)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: This case is set for an initial status conference on 2/12/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 2/5/19. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xavier Dupree, Robin McDaniels, Anthony Mines, Cletter Dupree, Tisha Dupree, Wanda Dupree as to Johnson on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; Michelli on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; Trevarthen on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; Woods-Ortiz on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Samuels, Jeanette)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xavier Dupree, Robin McDaniels, Anthony Mines, Cletter Dupree, Tisha Dupree, Wanda Dupree as to Village of Bellwood on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Samuels, Jeanette)
December 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Johnson, Michelli, Trevarthen, Village of Bellwood, Woods-Ortiz (pj, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
December 19, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cletter Dupree, Tisha Dupree, Wanda Dupree, Xavier Dupree, as Father and Next Friend of X.D., A.D., and A.R., Robin McDaniels, on behalf of herself and as Mother and Next Friend of S.B. and L.M., Anthony Mines by Jeanette S. Samuels (Samuels, Jeanette)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Xavier Dupree, as Father and Next Friend of X.D., A.D., and A.R., Robin McDaniels, on behalf of herself and as Mother and Next Friend of S.B. and L.M., Anthony Mines, Cletter Dupree, Tisha Dupree, Wanda Dupree; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15293778. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Samuels, Jeanette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dupree et al v. Village of Bellwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevarthen
Represented By: Shawnte Miaundra Raines
Represented By: Emanuel C. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woods-Ortiz
Represented By: Shawnte Miaundra Raines
Represented By: Emanuel C. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Represented By: Shawnte Miaundra Raines
Represented By: Emanuel C. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Officers
Represented By: Shawnte Miaundra Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Bellwood
Represented By: Shawnte Miaundra Raines
Represented By: Emanuel C. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelli
Represented By: Shawnte Miaundra Raines
Represented By: Emanuel C. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cletter Dupree
Represented By: Jeanette S. Samuels
Represented By: Jeanette Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin McDaniels, on behalf of herself and as Mother and Next Friend of S.B. and L.M.
Represented By: Jeanette S. Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisha Dupree
Represented By: Jeanette S. Samuels
Represented By: Jeanette Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mines
Represented By: Jeanette S. Samuels
Represented By: Jeanette Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Dupree, as Father and Next Friend of X.D., A.D., and A.R.
Represented By: Jeanette S. Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Dupree
Represented By: Jeanette S. Samuels
Represented By: Jeanette Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin McDaniels
Represented By: Jeanette Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Dupree
Represented By: Jeanette Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?