Benjamin v. Leibowitz

Appellant: J. Kevin Benjamin
Appellee: David P. Leibowitz
Case Number: 1:2018cv08354
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Appellant's brief is due by 2/28/2019. Appellee's response is due 4/4/2019. Appellant's reply brief is due by 5/2/2019. The 1/29/2019 status hearing is vacated and reset for 6/4/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter ROA, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 1/29/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER sheet (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter NOA2)(USBC-Gonzalez, ). (Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office). Modified on 12/27/2018 (mc, ).
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Rule 8010(3)) (mc, )
December 20, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (jn, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 16 A 326 (Judge Hollis) (Attachments: #1 DC Order Judge Durkin, #2 Transmittal Letter NOA, #3 Adv Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: J. Kevin Benjamin
Represented By: Theresa S. Benjamin
Represented By: J. Kevin Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David P. Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?