Hayes et al v. BMO Harris, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Susana Hayes and Patrick Hayes
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Consumers Credit Union, as successor by merger to Premier Credit Union, Fifth Third Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Bank of America, N.A., BMO Harris, N.A. and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv08365
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Referring Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 88 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The parties having filed a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #86 , the claims against Defendant BMO Harris, N.A. are dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. All claims have been addressed, all pending hearing dates and motions are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 87 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #85 , all claims against Defendant Fifth Third Bank are dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Fifth Third Bank is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice as Defendant. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 86 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant BMO Harris, N.A. (Hijazin, Majdi)
September 16, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Patrick Hayes, Susana Hayes as to Fifth Third Bank (Hijazin, Majdi)
September 16, 2019 Filing 84 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: By request and agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 9/17/2019 is stricken and reset for 10/1/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 83 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The parties having filed a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #80 , #81 , #82 , the claims against Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, and Consumer Credit Union are dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 82 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Consumer Credit Union (Hijazin, Majdi)
June 28, 2019 Filing 81 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only (Miller, Debra)
June 27, 2019 Filing 80 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Equifax Information Services LLC Only (Hijazin, Majdi)
June 25, 2019 Filing 79 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. Counsel for BMO Harris but did not appear. Plaintiff reported that a settlement demand is outstanding as to defendant BMO Harris. BMO Harris shall respond in writing to Plaintiff's most recent settlement demand by 6/28/2019. Status hearing set for 9/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
June 17, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE by Patrick Hayes, Susana Hayes of Settlement as to Consumers Credit Union, only (Hijazin, Majdi)
May 22, 2019 Filing 77 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, Plaintiffs' expert disclosures are due by 7/29/2019; Defendants' expert disclosures are due by 8/29/2019. All other previously-entered deadlines #63 remain firm. Status hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE by Patrick Hayes, Susana Hayes of Settlement as to Equifax Only (Hijazin, Majdi)
May 16, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE by TransUnion, LLC (Joint) Between Plaintiff And Trans Union, LLC Only (Miller, Debra)
May 10, 2019 Filing 74 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The parties having filed a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #73 , the claims against Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC are dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Mailed notice (ef, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 73 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Hijazin, Majdi)
April 23, 2019 Filing 72 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. The parties having filed a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #71 , the claims against Defendant Bank of America, N.A. are dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The remaining parties should be prepared to discuss prospects for settlement at the next status hearing. Status hearing set for 5/22/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 71 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Hijazin, Majdi)
March 27, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE by Patrick Hayes, Susana Hayes of Settlement as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Hijazin, Majdi)
March 6, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE by Patrick Hayes, Susana Hayes of Settlement as to Fifth Third Bank Only (Hijazin, Majdi)
March 4, 2019 Filing 68 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(Kern, Joseph)
February 28, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE by Patrick Hayes, Susana Hayes of Settlement as to Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Hijazin, Majdi)
February 25, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Consumers Credit Union, as successor by merger to Premier Credit Union(Janski, Ryan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Hayes, Susana Hayes. (Hijazin, Majdi)
February 25, 2019 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE of Service for Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Tameika L. Montgomery on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Montgomery, Tameika)
February 21, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Miller, Debra)
February 20, 2019 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer #33 is granted. Defendant Consumers Credit Union shall answer or otherwise plead by 2/25/2019. All remaining Defendants that have appeared and not answered, shall answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' complaint by 3/1/2019. The Court adopts the discovery schedule proposed in the parties' Joint Status Report #13 as follows. The parties may supplement their mandatory initial discovery responses by 9/13/2019; fact discovery shall be completed by 10/15/2019; Plaintiffs' expert disclosures by 7/1/2019; Defendants' expert disclosures are due by 8/12019; all expert depositions shall be completed by 10/15/2019; and any dispositive motions shall be filed by 12/16/2019. Status hearing set for 4/23/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 61 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Consumers Credit Union, as successor by merger to Premier Credit Union by Ryan Donald Janski (Janski, Ryan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants' Motions for extension of time #50 , #55 , and #57 are granted. Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC shall answer or otherwise plead by 2/22/2019. Defendant, Bank of America, N.A. shall answer or otherwise plead by 3/1/2019. Defendant Fifth Third Bank shall answer or otherwise plead by 3/8/2019. The motion presentment date of 2/20/2019 is stricken. Defendant Fifth Third Bank is excused from attending the status hearing set for 2/20/2019. Status hearing set for 2/20/2019 remains firm. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Motion by Karen Naguib George for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #33 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (George, Karen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 58 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Joseph D Kern for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #57 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kern, Joseph)
February 15, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint, #15 , Agreed (Kern, Joseph) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 2/15/2019 (lf, )).
February 15, 2019 Filing 56 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by David F Pustilnik for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #55 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pustilnik, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION by Defendant Bank of America, N.A. for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Pustilnik, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to amended complaint by BMO Harris, N.A.(Jamison, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2019 Filing 53 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Joseph D Kern for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #52 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kern, Joseph)
February 15, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint, #15 Agreed (Kern, Joseph)(Incorrect document attached) Modified on 2/15/2019 (lf, ).
February 15, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Motion by Isaac J. Colunga for presentment of extension of time #50 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Colunga, Isaac)
February 15, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION by Defendant Fifth Third Bank for extension of time and Request to be Excused from Appearing at the Previously Scheduled Initial Status Hearing (Colunga, Isaac)
February 13, 2019 Filing 49 STATUS Report (Joint) Initial by TransUnion, LLC (Miller, Debra)
February 11, 2019 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: defendant's Motion for extension of time to answer #44 is granted. Defendant BMO Harris Bank N.A. shall answer or otherwise plead by 2/16/2019. The motion presentment date of 2/12/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 47 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Consumers Credit Union, as successor by merger to Premier Credit Union by Karen Naguib George (George, Karen)
February 6, 2019 Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BMO Harris, N.A. by Jeffrey Edmund Jamison (Jamison, Jeffrey)
February 6, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Edmund Jamison for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #44 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Jamison, Jeffrey)
February 6, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION by Defendant BMO Harris, N.A. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint, #15 (Jamison, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2019 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's Motion for extension of time to answer #38 is granted. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall answer or otherwise plead by 2/15/2019. The motion presentment date of 2/5/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Misty L. Peterson (Peterson, Misty)
January 31, 2019 Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Tameika L. Montgomery (Montgomery, Tameika)
January 29, 2019 Filing 40 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bank of America, N.A. (Pustilnik, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Motion by David F Pustilnik for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #38 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/5/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pustilnik, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION by Defendant Bank of America, N.A. for extension of time to file answer (Pustilnik, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bank of America, N.A. by David F Pustilnik (Pustilnik, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants' Motions for extension of time to answer #21 and #30 are granted. Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Defendant Fifth Third Bank shall answer or otherwise plead by 2/15/2019. The motion presentment date of 1/30/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by Consumers Credit Union, as successor by merger to Premier Credit Union re attorney appearance #32 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Norkett, Brian)
January 28, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to amended complaint and Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC(Lewis, Rodney)
January 28, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Defendant Consumers Credit Union, as successor by merger to Premier Credit Union for extension of time to file answer (Norkett, Brian)
January 28, 2019 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Consumers Credit Union, as successor by merger to Premier Credit Union by Brian W. Norkett (Norkett, Brian)
January 25, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Isaac J. Colunga for presentment of extension of time #30 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 1/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Colunga, Isaac)
January 25, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendant Fifth Third Bank for extension of time to File its First Responsive Pleading (Colunga, Isaac)
January 25, 2019 Filing 29 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Fifth Third Bank and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Colunga, Isaac)
January 25, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fifth Third Bank by Kelsey Nicole Weyhing (Weyhing, Kelsey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fifth Third Bank by Isaac J. Colunga (Colunga, Isaac)
January 24, 2019 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Lewis, Rodney)
January 24, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC(Lewis, Rodney)
January 24, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Rodney L. Lewis (Lewis, Rodney)
January 24, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Mary Kathryn Curry (Curry, Mary)
January 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph D Kern for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #21 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 1/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kern, Joseph)
January 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint, #15 (Kern, Joseph)
January 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TransUnion, LLC (Miller, Debra)
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to amended complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC(Miller, Debra)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TransUnion, LLC by Debra A. Miller (Miller, Debra)
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 2/20/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susana Hayes, Patrick Hayes as to Bank of America, N.A. on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Susana Hayes, Patrick Hayes against BMO Harris, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Consumers Credit Union, as successor by merger to Premier Credit Union, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Fifth Third Bank, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, TransUnion, LLC (Hijazin, Majdi)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Joseph D Kern (Kern, Joseph)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by David M Schultz (Schultz, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susana Hayes, Patrick Hayes as to Consumers Credit Union, as successor by merger to Premier Credit Union on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TransUnion, LLC by Michael Joseph Sreenan (Sreenan, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TransUnion, LLC by Laura K. Rang (Rang, Laura)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susana Hayes, Patrick Hayes as to Fifth Third Bank on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susana Hayes, Patrick Hayes as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susana Hayes, Patrick Hayes as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susana Hayes, Patrick Hayes as to TransUnion, LLC on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
January 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susana Hayes, Patrick Hayes as to BMO Harris, N.A. on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
December 28, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Consumers Credit Union, as successor by merger to Premier Credit Union (pj, )
December 27, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BMO Harris, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Fifth Third Bank, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, and TransUnion, LLC. (acm)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood for all further proceedings. Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/2018.(pk, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
December 20, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Hayes, Susana Hayes by Majdi Y. Hijazin (Hijazin, Majdi)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Susana Hayes, Patrick Hayes; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15303217. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hijazin, Majdi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes et al v. BMO Harris, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana Hayes
Represented By: Majdi Y. Hijazin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Hayes
Represented By: Majdi Y. Hijazin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: David M Schultz
Represented By: Joseph D Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumers Credit Union, as successor by merger to Premier Credit Union
Represented By: Karen Naguib George
Represented By: Brian W. Norkett
Represented By: Ryan Donald Janski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Kelsey Nicole Weyhing
Represented By: Isaac J. Colunga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Curry
Represented By: Rodney L. Lewis
Represented By: Tameika L. Montgomery
Represented By: Misty L. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: David F Pustilnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris, N.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey Edmund Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Sreenan
Represented By: Laura K. Rang
Represented By: Debra A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?