Mandel v. SEIU Local 73 et al

Plaintiff: Erich Mandel
Defendant: Community Consolidated School District 15 and SEIU Local 73
Case Number: 1:2018cv08385
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Crossclaim by SEIU Local 73(Goldsmith, Eileen)
February 7, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 2/7/2019. Initial MIDP discovery shall be completed on or before 2/28/2019. Case management conference set for 3/19/2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the status hearing previously set for 2/7/2019 at 9:45 a.m. is reset for 2/7/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. (Note Time Change Only) Mailed notice (gel, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Scott Kronland and Eileen Goldsmith's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #12 and #13 are granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS Report filed jointly by all parties by Erich Mandel (Schwab, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by SEIU Local 73 (Kronland, Scott)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by SEIU Local 73(Kronland, Scott)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM by Community Consolidated School District 15 against SEIU Local 73 . by Community Consolidated School District 15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Manning, Jason)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Community Consolidated School District 15 by Christopher Lee Schaeffer (Schaeffer, Christopher)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Community Consolidated School District 15 by Jason T. Manning (Manning, Jason)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15400396. (Goldsmith, Eileen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15400298. (Kronland, Scott)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SEIU Local 73 by George A. Luscombe, III (Luscombe, George)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SEIU Local 73 by Robert E. Bloch (Bloch, Robert)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Erich Mandel regarding Complaint and Summons served on Defendant SEIU on 1/7/19 (Mcquaid, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Erich Mandel regarding Complaint and Summons served on Defendant District 15 on 1/4/19 (Mcquaid, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 2/7/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 1/28/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erich Mandel by James Joseph Mcquaid (Mcquaid, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDPs intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 1/31/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 1/21/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 21, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Community Consolidated School District 15, SEIU Local 73 (yt)
December 21, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erich Mandel by Jeffrey M. Schwab (Schwab, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schwab, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Erich Mandel; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15307109. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Schwab, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mandel v. SEIU Local 73 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Consolidated School District 15
Represented By: Christopher Lee Schaeffer
Represented By: Jason T. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 73
Represented By: Robert E. Bloch
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: George A. Luscombe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erich Mandel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Schwab
Represented By: James Joseph Mcquaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?