Singh v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Deepti Singh
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Mirash Dedvukaj, Martha Medina-Maltes and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2018cv08395
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deepti Singh by Caryn Cecelia Lederer (Lederer, Caryn)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deepti Singh as to L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services; Executed on 12/27/2018, Answer due 2/25/2019. Mirash Dedvukaj, and Martha Medina-Maltes; Executed on 12/28/2018, Answer due 2/26/2019. (Badlani, Chirag) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 1/18/2019 (jh, ).
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Mirash Dedvukaj, Martha Medina-Maltes, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Oswald, Craig)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018:Mailed notice(mc, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
December 21, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (lw, )
December 21, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to L. Francis Cissna, Mirash Dedvukaj, Martha Medina-Maltes, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (lw, )
December 21, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deepti Singh by Kalman D. Resnick (Resnick, Kalman)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deepti Singh by Chirag Gopal Badlani (Badlani, Chirag)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Badlani, Chirag)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Deepti Singh; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15308052. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Badlani, Chirag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirash Dedvukaj
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Medina-Maltes
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deepti Singh
Represented By: Chirag Gopal Badlani
Represented By: Kalman D. Resnick
Represented By: Caryn Cecelia Lederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?