Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.175.14.197 and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv08443
Filed: December 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER : Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/2/2019. Mailed notice. (etv, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #5 is granted without an appearance. Initial status hearing set for 3/4/2019 at 9:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion to serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Confernece #5 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/8/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Schulz, Mary) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 1/2/2019 (jh, ).
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion to serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Confernece #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 1/2/2019 (jh, ).
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC to serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Confernece. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 1/2/2019 (jh, ).
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (jh, )
December 26, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15311465. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.175.14.197
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?