Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 69.232.104.52 and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv08444
Filed: December 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing set for 2/28/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third party subpoena #6 is granted. No appearance is necessary on 1/17/2019. Mailed notice (ags, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/17/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 2/28/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 26, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Copyright Registration) (kp, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15311475. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 69.232.104.52
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?