Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 98.227.160.219
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 98.227.160.219
Case Number: 1:2018cv08459
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a subpoena on Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC #5 is granted. The initial status hearing is set for 3/11/2019 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/9/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (#1 Attachment). (yap, )
December 26, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15312549. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 98.227.160.219
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 98.227.160.219
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?