Phillips v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Louis Willie Phillips, Jr.
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv08486
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, within 60 days after the filing of the administrative record, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review. Within 45 days thereafter, the Commissioner shall file a response and brief in support of affirming the decision subject to review. The plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days thereafter. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Rowland's standing orders for Social Security Cases and Agreed Orders, which are available on Judge Rowland's webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (mma, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Manish S. Shah no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/8/19. (smm, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Spector, Deborah)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 DESIGNATION of Ernest Yi Ling as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill (Ling, Ernest)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT filed by Louis Willie Phillips, Jr. (smm, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, )
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice.(rp, )
December 27, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Louis Willie Phillips, Jr by Justin Roger Poh (Poh, Justin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Louis Willie Phillips, Jr by Joseph Stephen Sellers (Sellers, Joseph)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Louis Willie Phillips, Jr by Deborah Susan Spector (Spector, Deborah)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Louis Willie Phillips, Jr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Spector, Deborah)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spector, Deborah)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Louis Willie Phillips, Jr; (Spector, Deborah) Modified on 12/28/2018 (las, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Ernest Yi Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Willie Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Sellers
Represented By: Justin Roger Poh
Represented By: Deborah Susan Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?