Salkauskaite v. Sephora USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Auste Salkauskaite
Defendant: Sephora USA, Inc. and Modiface, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08507
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Auste Salkauskaite. (Sheikali, Jad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Jurowicz, Hannah)
February 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Modiface, Inc. (jjr, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. The Court adopts the discovery schedule proposed in the parties' Joint Status Report #15 modified as follows. Mandatory initial discovery responses shall be made by 2/18/2019; ESI disclosures shall be made by 4/1/2019; fact discovery shall be completed by 10/19/2019; Plaintiff's expert disclosures and report shall be served by 11/20/2019; Defendant's expert disclosures and reports shall be served by 2/20/2020; expert depositions shall be completed by 5/20/20; and any dispositive motions shall be filed by 7/22/2020. The parties' agreed motion for entry of protective order shall be filed no later than 3/7/2019. Status hearing set for 6/5/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS Report [Parties' Joint Initial Status Report] by Auste Salkauskaite (Sheikali, Jad)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (and Affirmative Defenses) by Sephora USA, Inc.(Jurowicz, Hannah)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 2/7/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint #10 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 1/17/2019. The motion presentment date of 1/2/2019 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (cn).
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 (UNOPPOSED) NOTICE of Motion by Hannah Yeon Mee Jurowicz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #10 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 1/2/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Jurowicz, Hannah)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.Leave to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (UNOPPOSED) (Jurowicz, Hannah)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. by Hannah Yeon Mee Jurowicz (Jurowicz, Hannah)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Auste Salkauskaite by Jad Sheikali (Sheikali, Jad)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (tt, )
December 28, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. by Maile H. Solis (Solis, Maile)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure by Sephora USA, Inc. (Shapiro, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. by Robert Eliot Shapiro (Shapiro, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, Chancery Division, case number (2018 CH 14379) filed by Sephora USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15318665. Exhibit A Declaration of Benhur Castro and Exhibit B Summons and Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shapiro, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Shapiro, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salkauskaite v. Sephora USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auste Salkauskaite
Represented By: David Louis Gerbie
Represented By: Myles P. McGuire
Represented By: Jad Sheikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sephora USA, Inc.
Represented By: Maile H. Solis
Represented By: Robert Eliot Shapiro
Represented By: Hannah Yeon Mee Jurowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modiface, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?