Nasrabadi v. Kameli

Plaintiff: Mansour Merrikhi Nasrabadi
Defendant: Taher Kameli
Case Number: 1:2018cv08514
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Taher Kameli for leave to file excess pages unopposed (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Albukerk, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Taher Kameli to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Albukerk, John)
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's motion to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline (MIDP) is granted. Defendant is to answer or otherwise plead by 2/25/2019. Motion hearing held on 1/29/2019. Status hearing set for 3/6/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Mansour Merrikhi Nasrabadiin Opposition to MOTION to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline (MIDP) #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Opposition)(Flynn, Kevin)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by John Nicolas Albukerk for presentment of Motion to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline #11 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/29/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Albukerk, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline (MIDP) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Albukerk, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Taher Kameli by John Nicolas Albukerk (Albukerk, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mansour Merrikhi Nasrabadi as to Taher Kameli on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Flynn, Kevin)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Joint status report is due by 3/1/2019. Status hearing is set for 3/6/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/8/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion to appear pro hac vice #5 is granted; Attorney Thomas Joel Weiss for Mansour Nasrabadi added. Mailed notice (srn, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Mansour Merrikhi Nasrabadi (Weiss, Thomas)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15331215. (Weiss, Thomas)
January 2, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Taher Kameli (jjr, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
December 28, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mansour Merrikhi Nasrabadi by Kevin Michael Flynn (Flynn, Kevin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Flynn, Kevin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mansour Merrikhi Nasrabadi; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15319670. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Complaint Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Complaint Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Complaint Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Complaint Ex. E)(Flynn, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasrabadi v. Kameli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansour Merrikhi Nasrabadi
Represented By: Kevin Michael Flynn
Represented By: Thomas Joel Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taher Kameli
Represented By: John Nicolas Albukerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?