Rushing v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Lavette Rushing
Defendant: Transunion LLC and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08544
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Michelle Lavette Rushing. (Daher, Marwan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Defendant Caliber's motion to dismiss #19 . Plaintiff is advised to review the Courts standing order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Courts homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The Court's Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether she will amend her complaint or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall be prepared to make her election at the status hearing on 2/27/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. The 3/5/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Berkely Yvonne Cobb for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #19 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/5/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Cobb, Berkely)
February 19, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Cobb, Berkely)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 First AMENDED complaint by Michelle Lavette Rushing against Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Transunion LLC (Daher, Marwan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS Report by Michelle Lavette Rushing (Daher, Marwan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:Defendant Caliber Home Loans' motion to extend time #13 is granted, and this Defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading by 2/18/19. The initial status conference previously set for 2/14/19 is stricken and reset for 2/27/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203, and the parties shall file their joint initial status report by 2/18/19. The 1/29/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (clw, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Transunion LLC(Brown, William)
January 21, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Motion for Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer NOTICE of Motion by Berkely Yvonne Cobb for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/29/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Cobb, Berkely)
January 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. for extension of time to file answer Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Cobb, Berkely)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. by Yasamin Nicole Oloomi (Oloomi, Yasamin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. by Berkely Yvonne Cobb (Cobb, Berkely)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transunion LLC by Michael Joseph Sreenan (Sreenan, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transunion LLC by William R. Brown (Brown, William)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Lavette Rushing as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc. on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Sulaiman, Omar)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 2/14/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 2/4/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Lavette Rushing as to Transunion LLC on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Sulaiman, Omar)
January 2, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and Transunion LLC. (jjr, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
January 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dal, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michelle Lavette Rushing by Marwan R. Daher (Daher, Marwan)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michelle Lavette Rushing by Alexander James Taylor (Taylor, Alexander)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michelle Lavette Rushing by Omar Tayseer Sulaiman (Sulaiman, Omar)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michelle Lavette Rushing; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15322172. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sulaiman, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushing v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Sreenan
Represented By: William R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Berkely Yvonne Cobb
Represented By: Yasamin Nicole Oloomi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lavette Rushing
Represented By: Omar Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: Marwan R. Daher
Represented By: Alexander James Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?