Anand v. Heath et al
Plaintiff: Narantuya Anand
Defendant: Lexington Law Firm, Fluent, Inc., Porgrexion Marketing, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC, ., John C Heath, Progrexion Marketing, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC and John C Heath Attorney at Law PLLC doing business as Lexington Law Firm
Case Number: 1:2019cv00016
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:: Upon receipt of the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice #46 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all scheduled hearings and deadlines are stricken and any pending motions are denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (air, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 46 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Frisch, Craig)
September 9, 2019 Filing 45 Notice of Settlement by Narantuya Anand with Defendants Fluent, Inc. and Reward Zone USA, LLC (Frisch, Craig)
August 15, 2019 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants' motion for reconsideration #41 is taken under advisement. A response to the motion by the plaintiff is due by 9/12/19; defendants' reply is due by 9/19/19. The status hearing set for 9/25/19 is stricken. Mailed notice (air, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Motion by John David Fitzpatrick for presentment of motion for reconsideration #41 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Fitzpatrick, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM by Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC in support of motion for reconsideration #41 (Fitzpatrick, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION by Defendants Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order #35 (Fitzpatrick, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Fluent Defendants Affirmative Defenses (Document # 36) by Narantuya Anand(Frisch, Craig)
July 22, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendants John C Heath, Progrexion Marketing, Inc.. (DiRago, Mary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendants Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC. (ASnen, Neil)
July 16, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Narantuya Anand. (Frisch, Craig)
July 11, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint by Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC(Fitzpatrick, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 6/28/2019. Mailed notice(air, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 9/25/19 at 9:00 a.m. Defendants Fluent, Inc. and Reward Zone's motion to compel arbitration #21 is denied. The Court will issue an opinion shortly. Once the parties have made their complete MIDP exchanges, which are due by 7/19/19, they may move forward with discovery thereafter. Defendants' answers are due by 7/11/19. Mailed notice (cn).
May 10, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:he status hearing currently set for 5/14 is re-scheduled to 6/20 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY by Defendants Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC to motion to compel #21 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Bhadania Decl.)(Fitzpatrick, John)
April 9, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Narantuya Anand to motion to compel #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Frisch, Craig)
March 18, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Narantuya Anand to answer to complaint #24 Answers to Lexington Law's Affirmative and Other Defenses (Frisch, Craig)
March 18, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Narantuya Anand to answer to complaint #25 Answers to Progrexion Marketing's Affirmative and Other Defenses (Frisch, Craig)
March 12, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Defendants Fluent, Inc. and Reward Zone's motion to compel arbitration #21 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response to the motion is due by 4/9/19; defendants' reply is due by 4/23/19. If defendants Heath and Progrexion join the motion to compel #21 , they are to do so by 3/19/19. The same briefing schedule will apply. Any MIDP obligations are held in abeyance until further order. A status hearing is set on 5/14/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 27 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Narantuya Anand (Frisch, Craig)
February 26, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Presentment on defendants' motion to compel arbitration is reset from 3/5 to 3/12/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by Progrexion Marketing, Inc. (DiRago, Mary)
February 25, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by John C Heath(DiRago, Mary)
February 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by John David Fitzpatrick for presentment of motion to compel #21 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/5/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Fitzpatrick, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC in support of motion to compel #21 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitenkumar Bhadania, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Fitzpatrick, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendants Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC to compel Arbitration (Fitzpatrick, John)
January 31, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Neil Ansen's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #19 is granted. Mailed notice (air, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15430259. (ASnen, Neil)
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The agreed motion to extend time to respond to plaintiff's complaint to 2/25/19 #15 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The initial status conference currently scheduled for 2/12 is reset to 3/12/19 at 9:00 a.m. Initial status report due 3/5.Mailed notice (air, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC by George V. Desh (Desh, George)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by John David Fitzpatrick for presentment of extension of time #15 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Fitzpatrick, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC for extension of time to respond to complaint (agreed) (Fitzpatrick, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA, LLC by John David Fitzpatrick (Fitzpatrick, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The agreed motion to extend time to respond to plaintiff's complaint #11 is granted. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by 2/25/19. No appearance on the motion is required. The initial status conference scheduled for 2/12/19 is reset to 3/6/19 at 9:00 a.m. The initial status report is due by 2/28/19. Mailed notice (air, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Mary S DiRago for presentment of extension of time #11 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/24/2019 at 09:00 AM. (DiRago, Mary)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants John C Heath, Progrexion Marketing, Inc. for extension of time Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (DiRago, Mary)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants John C Heath, Progrexion Marketing, Inc. by Mary S DiRago (DiRago, Mary)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: This case is set for an initial status conference on 2/12/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 2/5/19. Mailed notice (air, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Narantuya Anand as to Progrexion Marketing, Inc. on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Raphael, Lance)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Narantuya Anand as to Fluent, Inc. on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Raphael, Lance)
January 3, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Fluent, Inc., Progrexion Marketing, Inc. (jjr, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Narantuya Anand by Christopher Davis Kruger (Kruger, Christopher)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Narantuya Anand by Craig Rein Frisch (Frisch, Craig)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Narantuya Anand by Lance A. Raphael (Raphael, Lance)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Raphael, Lance)
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Narantuya Anand; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15326057.(Raphael, Lance)
January 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anand v. Heath et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narantuya Anand
Represented By: Christopher Davis Kruger
Represented By: Craig Rein Frisch
Represented By: Lance A. Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluent, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Eric Asnen
Represented By: John David Fitzpatrick
Represented By: George V. Desh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porgrexion Marketing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reward Zone USA, LLC, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Heath
Represented By: Mary S DiRago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progrexion Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Mary S DiRago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reward Zone USA, LLC
Represented By: Neil Eric Asnen
Represented By: John David Fitzpatrick
Represented By: George V. Desh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Heath Attorney at Law PLLC doing business as Lexington Law Firm
Represented By: Mary S DiRago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?