Martin v. Garcia

Plaintiff: Larry Martin
Defendant: E. Garcia and City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2019cv00155
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 FORWARDED RECEIVED USM-285 form for defendant(s) Garcia to the U.S. Marshal's Office (pk, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Larry Martin of Change of Address (pk, )
February 8, 2019 MAILED to Plaintiff a blank USM-285 service form, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of order dated 2/7/2019. (pk, )
February 8, 2019 MAILED a copy of order dated 2/7/2019 to the trust fund officer of the facility having custody of Plaintiff. (pk, )
February 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued along with USM 285 form(s), certified copy of order dated 2/7/2018 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendant E. Garcia (pk, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT filed by Larry Martin. (Exhibits) (pk, )
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $33.32 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to (1) send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer of the facility having custody of Plaintiff; (2) file Plaintiff's complaint #1 ; (3) terminate City of Chicago as Defendant in this action from the docket; (4) issue summons for service on Defendant Detective E. Garcia by the U.S. Marshal; and (5) send Plaintiff a blank USM-285 service form, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of this order. Plaintiff must complete and return a USM-285 form for service on Defendant. Failure to return the USM-285 by March 15, 2019, may result in dismissal of this case in its entirety. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If Plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. The U.S. Marshal will not attempt service on Defendant unless and until the required USM-285 form is received. The U.S. Marshal is appointed to serve Defendant. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice to renewal later in this case. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/7/2019. Mailed notice. (pk, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Larry Martin for attorney representation (pk, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Larry Martin for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibit) (pk, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pk, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Larry Martin. (Exhibits) (pk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?