Komorski v. OHM Concession Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sylvia Komorski
Defendant: Global Payments, Inc., OHM Concession Group, LLC, OHM Chicago, LLC and Cross Match Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00157
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cross Match Technologies, Inc. by Nicola C Menaldo (Menaldo, Nicola)
February 27, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion of Mark S. Mester, Kathleen P. Lally and Peter A. Shaeffer to withdraw as counsel #17 is granted. Motion hearing set for 2/28/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants OHM Chicago, LLC, OHM Concession Group, LLC by Mary A. Smigielski (Smigielski, Mary)
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #12 , #14 and #16 are granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Patricia Lally for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #17 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 2/28/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Lally, Kathleen)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Attorney Mark S. Mester, Kathleen P. Lally, Peter A. Shaeffer to withdraw as attorney for Cross Match Technologies, Inc.. No party information provided (Lally, Kathleen)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15512874. (Fahringer, Susan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants OHM Chicago, LLC, OHM Concession Group, LLC by Rashad Anthony Simmons (Simmons, Rashad)
February 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15506478. (Menaldo, Nicola)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cross Match Technologies, Inc. by Debra Rae Bernard (Bernard, Debra)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15452412. (Kitchura, John)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Parties joint motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to a date after private mediation #9 is granted. Parties to submit a joint status report by 03/22/2019. Status hearing set for 3/26/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Jad Sheikali for presentment of extension of time #9 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/17/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Sheikali, Jad)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Sylvia Komorski for extension of time (Parties' Joint Motion) (Sheikali, Jad)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Global Payments, Inc. by Ethan Emery White (White, Ethan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (tt, )
January 9, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cross Match Technologies, Inc. (Lally, Kathleen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cross Match Technologies, Inc. by Peter A. Shaeffer (Shaeffer, Peter)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cross Match Technologies, Inc. by Kathleen Patricia Lally (Lally, Kathleen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cross Match Technologies, Inc. by Mark Steven Mester (Mester, Mark)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lally, Kathleen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2017-CH-12838) filed by Cross Match Technologies, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15347960. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Lally, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Komorski v. OHM Concession Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Payments, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Emery White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHM Concession Group, LLC
Represented By: Rashad Anthony Simmons
Represented By: Mary A. Smigielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHM Chicago, LLC
Represented By: Rashad Anthony Simmons
Represented By: Mary A. Smigielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Match Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Steven Mester
Represented By: Kathleen Patricia Lally
Represented By: Peter A. Shaeffer
Represented By: Nicola C Menaldo
Represented By: John M. Kitchura, Jr.
Represented By: Debra Rae Bernard
Represented By: Susan D Fahringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Komorski
Represented By: Jad Sheikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?