United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $224,100 in United States currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $224,100 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00195
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Funds in the amount of $224,100 in United States currency by Jeffrey L. Widman (Widman, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 Verified ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Claimants Anthony and Debbie Cheng to Verified Complaint for Forfeiture, In Rem by Funds in the amount of $224,100 in United States currency(Gentile, Dominic)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Funds in the amount of $224,100 in United States currency by Dominic P. Gentile (Gentile, Dominic)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 WARRANT for Arrest in Rem Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals on 2/15/2019 as to funds in the amount of $224,100 in United States Currency (Attachments: #1 Warrant)(pk, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court sets the case for an initial status hearing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a) & (c) on 3/12/2019 at 9:30 a.m. and directs plaintiff's attorney to advise each claimant or its counsel of record in writing of the status hearing date. (mk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM by Funds in the amount of $224,100 in United States currency regarding complaint #2 (Gentile, Dominic)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice.(jjr, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued funds in the amount of $224,100. (pk, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Jeffrey Ryan Borup as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Borup, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT U.S. v. Funds in the Amount of $224,100 in United States Currency filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; (Borup, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Borup, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $224,100 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $224,100 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Represented By: Dominic P. Gentile
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Widman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Borup
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?