Imeri v. Social Security

Plaintiff: Ismail Imeri
Defendant: Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00196
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Ismail Imeri for attorney representation. (smm, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for more definite statement, which seeks an order directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint including Plaintiff's social security number, #12 , is granted. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this case, he must, by 3/8/19, file an amended complaint that includes his full social security number, so that Defendant can begin to prepare the administrative record and respond to the complaint. Consistent with the Court's normal procedures in Social Security cases, Plaintiff's personal identifiers will not be publicly accessible on the docket. The 2/21/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The time for Defendant to file her answer is tolled until 60 days following service of plaintiffs amended complaint. See Fed. R. Civ P. 12(a)(2). Status hearing set for 3/27/2019, is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas G. Snodgrass for presentment of motion for more definite statement #12 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/21/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Snodgrass, Douglas)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Social Securityfor more definite statement (Snodgrass, Douglas)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 DESIGNATION of Douglas G. Snodgrass as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Social Security (Snodgrass, Douglas)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Courts own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 3/27/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 3/18/19, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Additionally, the parties are strongly encouraged to consider consenting to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge. Should the parties elect to do so, they should notify Mrs. Lewis, and the case will be reassigned upon receipt of the signed consent form. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #3 is denied without prejudice. "There is no right to court-appointed counsel in federal civil litigation," Olson v. Morgan, 750 F.3d 708, 711 (7th Cir. 2014), but the Court has discretion to request that an attorney represent an indigent litigant on a volunteer basis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). In making the decision whether to recruit counsel, the Court must engage in a two-step analysis: (1) has the plaintiff made a reasonable attempt to obtain counsel on his own behalf or been effectively precluded from doing so; and, if so, (2) given the factual and legal complexity of the case, does this particular plaintiff appear competent to litigate the matter herself. Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007) (en banc). Factors to be considered include but are not limited to: (1) the stage of litigation, Romanelli v. Suliene, 615 F.3d 847, 852 (7th Cir. 2010); (2) plaintiffs submissions and pleadings, Olson, 750 F.3d at 712; (3) plaintiff's capabilities, including intelligence (IQ), literacy, degree of education, communication skills, and litigation experience, Pruitt, 503 F.3d at 655; and (4) the complexity of the case, id. Here, the Court finds that recruitment of counsel is not warranted at this time. Initially, Plaintiff paid the filing fee and has not demonstrated indigence. Additionally, he indicates in his motion for counsel that he graduated from high school and took some college classes, and he also indicates that he has made no effort to secure counsel on his own. For these reasons, Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #3 is denied. The Court encourages Plaintiff to continue in his efforts to obtain counsel by reaching out to attorneys who specialize in litigation related to appeals of Social Security Administration decisions. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice.(jjr, )
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (smm, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ismail Imeri. (smm, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Ismail Imeri for attorney representation. (smm, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 1 copy by Ismail Imeri. (smm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imeri v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Douglas G. Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismail Imeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?