Doctor's Associates LLC v. Shewmake
Plaintiff: Doctor's Associates LLC
Defendant: Daniel J Shewmake
Case Number: 1:2019cv00200
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Daniel J Shewmake. (mc, )
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Joint status report due by 3/15/2019. Status hearing set for 3/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/31/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Daniel J Shewmake. (kb, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Doctor's Associates LLC by Patrick J Johnson (Johnson, Patrick)
January 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Doctor's Associates LLC by James T. Rohlfing (Rohlfing, James)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rohlfing, James)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Doctor's Associates LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15357998. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Rohlfing, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doctor's Associates LLC v. Shewmake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J Shewmake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctor's Associates LLC
Represented By: Patrick J Johnson
Represented By: James T. Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?