Mendez v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Rodolfo Mendez
Defendant: John Doe Repossession Agency, Location Services Holdings, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N. A. and Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00207
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Due to an unanticipated family emergency, Judge Kennelly will not be able to hold court on 3/12/2019. The status hearing set for that date is, at the Court's instance, vacated and reset to 3/27/2019 at 8:30 AM. (mk)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A. by Michael Hercules Bornhorst (Bornhorst, Michael)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A. by Lucia Nale (Nale, Lucia)
March 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodolfo Mendez as to Location Services Holdings, LLC on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Bardo, Stacy)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodolfo Mendez as to Wells Fargo Bank N.A. on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Bardo, Stacy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The order setting the initial status hearing in this case incorrectly stated that the date for the hearing is 3/11/2019. The correct date and time is 3/12/2019 at 9:00 AM, in chambers. (mk)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 3/11/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
January 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Location Services Holdings, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (pj, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rodolfo Mendez by Stacy Michelle Bardo (Bardo, Stacy)
January 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rodolfo Mendez by Daniel Richard Brown (Brown, Daniel)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brown, Daniel)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rodolfo Mendez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15361469.(Brown, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Repossession Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Location Services Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Michael Hercules Bornhorst
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Mendez
Represented By: Daniel Richard Brown
Represented By: Stacy Michelle Bardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?