Dunn v. Dart et al

Plaintiff: Ayo Dunn
Defendant: CMB Premier Management, LLC, Cook County Sheriff Department, John Doe(s), John and Jane Does, Tom Dart and Jane Doe(s)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00216
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 MAILED an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions along with a copy of the order dated 2/15/2019 #7 to plaintiff Ayo Dunn. (sxb, )
February 21, 2019 EMAILED order dated 2/15/2019 #7 to Supervisor of the Inmate Trust Fund Accounts at Cook County Jail (sxb, )
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $15.10 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to electronically send a copy of this order to the Supervisor of the Inmate Trust Fund Accounts at the Cook County Jail. Summons, however, shall not issue. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit an amended complaint that states a federal claim against proper defendants. Failure to submit an amended complaint by 3-22, 2019 will result in dismissal of this lawsuit for failure to state a claim. Ruling on Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is deferred. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary discovery #5 is denied without prejudice to renewal. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 2/15/2019. Mailed notice (Received for docketing on 2/21/2019). (sxb, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in support of motion for appointment of counsel (bg, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Ayo Dunn for preliminary discovery order (bg, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Ayo Dunn for attorney representation (bg, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Ayo Dunn for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibit) (bg, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Ayo Dunn (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope not postmarked) (bg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMB Premier Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayo Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?