Mitchell v. LCSA Contra Costa County Dept of Child Support Customer Service

Plaintiff: Clarence H. Mitchell
Defendant: LCSA Contra Costa County Dept of Child Support Customer Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv00223
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Referring Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:On January 22, 2019, the Court denied Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and ordered Plaintiff to pay the $400 filing fee by February 19, 2019, in order to proceed with this case #10 . Instead of paying the filing fee, Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint #11 . The Court sua sponte grants Plaintiff an additional 21 days, until March 18, 2019, to pay the filing fee. If Plaintiff does not pay the fee by that date, his lawsuit will be dismissed. The Court reserves the initial review of Plaintiff's amended complaint #11 and his motion for attorney representation #5 until his fee status is resolved.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (NO CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENT) (jh, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED AMENDED Complaint by Clarence H. Mitchell; Jury Demand is Requested. (Exhibit) (jh, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff Clarence Mitchell's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is denied. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application indicates that his spouse, with whom he lives, earns approximately $2600 per month, or $31,200 per year. Thus, Plaintiff is not a pauper. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this litigation, he must pay the $400 filing fee. Failure to do so by February 19, 2019, will result in dismissal of this case. The Court defers its initial review of Plaintiff's complaint #1 and his motion for attorney representation #5 until his fee status is resolved. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/15/19.(gcy, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Clarence H. Mitchell for attorney representation (jh, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Clarence H. Mitchell for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Clarence H. Mitchell. (jh, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 1 copy by Clarence H. Mitchell. (Exhibit) (jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. LCSA Contra Costa County Dept of Child Support Customer Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence H. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCSA Contra Costa County Dept of Child Support Customer Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?