Liebich v. Illinois Department Of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Randy R. Liebich
Defendant: Illinois Department Of Corrections, Cayman Wilcox, Officer Shevlin, Officer Davenport, John Baldwin, Charles Best, Victor M. Perez, Joshua Clements, Tyneer Butler-Winters, Officer Starkey, Officer Johnson, Ethan A. Olson, Officer Rivera, Randy Pfister, Walter Nicholson and Byron Mitchell
Case Number: 1:2019cv00242
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy R. Liebich. Officer Johnson waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Leff, Alison)
February 27, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Officer Johnson by Alan Williams (Williams, Alan)
February 18, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy R. Liebich. Charles Best waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Leff, Alison)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Joint status report due by 4/3/2019. Status hearing set for 4/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/15/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy R. Liebich. Walter Nicholson waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Leff, Alison)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy R. Liebich. Randy Pfister waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Leff, Alison)
February 13, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Charles Best by Alan Williams (Williams, Alan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy R. Liebich. Victor M. Perez waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Leff, Alison)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy R. Liebich. Byron Mitchell waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Leff, Alison)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy R. Liebich. Tyneer Butler-Winters waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Leff, Alison)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy R. Liebich. Ethan A. Olson waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Leff, Alison)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Tyneer Butler-Winters, Byron Mitchell, Ethan A. Olson, Victor M. Perez by Alan Williams (Williams, Alan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy R. Liebich. Officer Davenport waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Leff, Alison) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office. (smm, ).
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy R. Liebich. Officer Shevlin waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Leff, Alison)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy R. Liebich. Officer Davenport waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Leff, Alison) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office). (smm, ).
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Officer Davenport, Walter Nicholson, Randy Pfister, Officer Shevlin by Alan Williams (Williams, Alan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
January 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Randy R. Liebich by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Randy R. Liebich by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Randy R. Liebich by Alison R Leff (Leff, Alison)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Randy R. Liebich; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15364783. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leff, Alison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liebich v. Illinois Department Of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department Of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cayman Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Shevlin
Represented By: Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Davenport
Represented By: Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Best
Represented By: Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor M. Perez
Represented By: Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyneer Butler-Winters
Represented By: Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Starkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Johnson
Represented By: Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan A. Olson
Represented By: Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Pfister
Represented By: Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Nicholson
Represented By: Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Mitchell
Represented By: Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy R. Liebich
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Alison R Leff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?