Harbor View Waukegan I, LLC v. American Tower Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Harbor View Waukegan I, LLC
Defendant: AT&T, Inc., American Tower Corporation, Sprint Corporation and Verizon Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00297
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 25 STATUS Report by American Tower Corporation (Noorigian, Gregory)
February 28, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sprint Corporation by Sohil M. Shah (Shah, Sohil)
February 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by William Choslovsky for presentment of motion to dismiss #22 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Choslovsky, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc. to dismiss and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Declaration of Angela Bonfield Frye)(Choslovsky, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Mark W. Lewis for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #17 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lewis, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory Tyler Noorigian for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #19 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Noorigian, Gregory)
February 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant American Tower Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noorigian, Gregory)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by AT&T, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #17 (Lewis, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant AT&T, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Lewis, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T, Inc. by Mark W. Lewis (Lewis, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Michael Westhoff for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #14 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Westhoff, Bryan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Sprint Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Westhoff, Bryan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sprint Corporation by Bryan Michael Westhoff (Westhoff, Bryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 1/29/2019. Defendants' unopposed motion to extend time to respond to complaint #9 is granted. Responsive pleadings to be filed by 2/19/2019. Status hearing set for 3/18/2019 at 9:00 AM to stand. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc. by William Choslovsky (Choslovsky, William)
January 21, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Simon A. Fleischmann for presentment of extension of time #9 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/29/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Fleischmann, Simon)
January 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant American Tower Corporation for extension of time for all Defendants to respond to the complaint (UNOPPOSED) (Fleischmann, Simon)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are reminded that responsive pleadings must comply with section A(3) of this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. Status hearing set for 3/18/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. In the event that the defendant files a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), the defendant is granted leave to notice that motion for presentment at the date and time of the status hearing. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, Daniel Howard Olswang. (jh, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Filing of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Noorigian, Gregory)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Tower Corporation by Simon A. Fleischmann (Fleischmann, Simon)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Tower Corporation by Gregory Tyler Noorigian (Noorigian, Gregory)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Noorigian, Gregory)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Lake County, Illinois, case number (18CH00001380) filed by American Tower Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15376789. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noorigian, Gregory)
January 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harbor View Waukegan I, LLC v. American Tower Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T, Inc.
Represented By: Mark W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Tower Corporation
Represented By: Simon A. Fleischmann
Represented By: Gregory Tyler Noorigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Corporation
Represented By: Sohil M. Shah
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: William Choslovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harbor View Waukegan I, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Howard Olswang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?