Jones v. Federal Personals et al

Plaintiff: Edward Jones, Jr.
Defendant: Federal Personals, Chase Bank, Waukegan County Department, VAC Personal State Personal, First Midwest Bank, H.V.D-Vash Personal, State Personannals, County Personnals and City Personnals
Case Number: 1:2019cv00317
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED complaint by Edward Jones, Jr against All Defendants (Exhibits). (tt, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #19 denied as moot in light of the 2/13/2019 order #11 . To the extent Plaintiff's motion #20 seeks judgment, it is denied as premature, without prejudice to renewal. The other motions #21 #22 #23 are denied because it is unclear what relief they are seeking. Status hearing set for 2/28/2019 #7 is stricken. The 4/11/2019 status hearing #11 shall stand.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff Edward Jones, Jr for jury trial. (Exhibit) (tt, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff Edward Jones, Jr for jury trial. (tt, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Edward Jones, Jr for jury trial. (tt, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Edward Jones, Jr for financial judgment 10 million dollar Rule 5b(a). (Exhibits) (tt, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Jones, Jr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (tt, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 STATEMENT by Edward Jones, Jr. (tt, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT by Edward Jones, Jr. (tt, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 STATEMENT by Edward Jones, Jr. (tt, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT by Edward Jones, Jr. (tt, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT by Edward Jones, Jr. (tt, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT by Edward Jones, Jr (tt, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT by Edward Jones, Jr (Exhibits). (tt, )
February 13, 2019 MAILED plaintiff an amended complaint form. (tt, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #10 is granted. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), the complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice because it does not state a viable claim against any defendant. The Clerk is directed to send an amended complaint form to Plaintiff. Plaintiff has until 3/20/2019 to prepare an amended complaint and send it to the Clerk of Court. The amended complaint must clearly state what each defendant did to Plaintiff and how Plaintiff was harmed by those actions. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal with prejudice of this case. Status hearing set for 4/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (jlj, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBITS by Plaintiff Edward Jones, Jr. (ew, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Jones, Jr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits). (tt, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 MAIL RETURNED, for document #7 sent to Edward Jones, Jr. returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (ew, )
January 22, 2019 MAILED plaintiff copy of order dated 1/18/18 #7 and a blank in forma pauperis form. (tt, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is denied without prejudice because it does not provide the information required to assess whether Plaintiff is entitled to pauper status. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a blank in forma pauperis form. Plaintiff has until 2/15/2019 to complete the form and return it to the Clerk. Failure to comply will result in the summary dismissal of this case. Status hearing set for 2/28/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice and IFP by judicial staff. (jlj, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 HOUSING DISCRIMINATION: violation Title VI 42 U.S.C 2000 e 42 USC 1983 claim eclial by Edward Jones, Jr (Exhibits) (tt, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Jones, Jr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (tt, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Edward Jones, Jr (tt, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (tt, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Edward Jones, Jr (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Documnet not imaged) (tt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Federal Personals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Personals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waukegan County Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VAC Personal State Personal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Midwest Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.V.D-Vash Personal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Personannals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Personnals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Personnals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?