Nwoke v. The University of Chicago Medical Center

Plaintiff: Chinyere Nwoke and Chinyere U. Nwoke
Defendant: The University of Chicago Medical Center and The University of Chicago Hospitals and Health System
Case Number: 1:2019cv00358
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by Chinyere U. Nwoke re amended complaint #28 (Nwoke, Chinyere)
March 11, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED complaint by Chinyere U. Nwoke against The University of Chicago Medical Center (Nwoke, Chinyere)
March 11, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's first motion for leave to amend her complaint #25 is granted. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint as a separate docket entry. This is Plaintiff's one amendment of right under Civil Rule 15(a)(1). Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint or, in the alternative, to stay this action #15 is denied as moot because it is directed at the original complaint. Defendant shall respond to the amended complaint by 3/25/2019. Plaintiff's motion to reschedule 4/2/2019 status hearing #23 is granted. The status hearing set for 4/2/2019 #22 is stricken and re-set for 4/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearings set for 3/13/2019 #24 and #26 are stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Chinyere U. Nwoke for presentment of motion to amend/correct #25 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/13/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Nwoke, Chinyere)
March 8, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Chinyere U. Nwoke to amend/correct notice of removal, #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nwoke, Chinyere)
March 7, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Motion to Reschedule April 2, 2019 Status Hearing date NOTICE of Motion by Chinyere U. Nwoke for presentment of before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/13/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Nwoke, Chinyere)
March 7, 2019 Filing 23 Motion to Reschedule April 2, 2019 Status Hearing date NOTICE of Motion by Chinyere U. Nwoke for presentment of before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/13/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nwoke, Chinyere)
March 6, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. The 4/15/2019 status hearing #14 is stricken and re-set for 4/2/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant's motion to dismiss or stay #15 is entered and continued. Defendant shall file a reply brief in support of the motion by 3/20/2019. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion to stay #18 is granted. The deadline to serve MIDP disclosures #14 is vacated and will be re-set if this case survives the Defendant's motion to dismiss or stay #15 .Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Chinyere U. Nwoke in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #15 , motion to stay #18 (Nwoke, Chinyere)
March 5, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Chinyere U. Nwokein Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The University of Chicago Medical Center (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Stay this Action) #15 , MOTION by Defendant The University of Chicago Medical Center to stay #18 (Nwoke, Chinyere)
February 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth N. Hall for presentment of motion to stay #18 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/6/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Hall, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant The University of Chicago Medical Center to stay (Hall, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth N. Hall for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #15 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/6/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Hall, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by The University of Chicago Medical Center in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #15 (Hall, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The University of Chicago Medical Center (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Stay this Action) (Hall, Elizabeth)
January 27, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #9 is granted. The time for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to 2/25/2019. Motion hearing set for 1/30/2019 #10 is stricken. Unless excused by the MIDP Standing Order, MIDP disclosures shall be served by 3/27/2019. The status hearing set for 2/28/2019 #8 is stricken and re-set for 4/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 4/8/2019. Mailed notice (jlj, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Chinyere Nwoke. (kp, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing by Chinyere Nwoke. (kp, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to plaintiff of record. (ew, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth N. Hall for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Hall, Elizabeth)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant The University of Chicago Medical Center for extension of time to file answer (Hall, Elizabeth)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 2/28/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to plaintiff of record (ek, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
January 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The University of Chicago Medical Center by Elizabeth N. Hall (Hall, Elizabeth)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The University of Chicago Medical Center by James Vincent Garvey (Garvey, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The University of Chicago Medical Center by Madeline Victoria Tzall (Tzall, Madeline)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tzall, Madeline)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, IL, case number (2018-L-013417) filed by The University of Chicago Medical Center Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15389775. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tzall, Madeline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nwoke v. The University of Chicago Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chinyere Nwoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chinyere U. Nwoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Chicago Medical Center
Represented By: James Vincent Garvey
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Hall
Represented By: Madeline Victoria Tzall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Chicago Hospitals and Health System
Represented By: James Vincent Garvey
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Hall
Represented By: Madeline Victoria Tzall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?