Stamps v. Children Home & Aid et al
Plaintiff: John C. Stamps, III
Defendant: Children Home & Aid, Nancy Ronguillo and Bruzeller Epps
Case Number: 1:2019cv00393
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 3/12/2019. Case is dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 , motion for writ of habeas corpus #5 and motion for attorney representation are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIVED Amended Complaint and no copies by John C. Stamps, III. (Exhibits) (ph, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing on Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 , petition #5 and motion for attorney representation #6 is set for 3/12/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff John C. Stamps, III regarding received complaint #1 (las, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/23/2019. (bg, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff John C. Stamps, III for attorney representation (las, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION by Plaintiff John C. Stamps, III for writ of habeas corpus or emergency motion for return of child. (las, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff John C. Stamps, III for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (las, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff John C. Stamps, III (las, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (las, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by John C. Stamps, III (Exhibits) (las, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stamps v. Children Home & Aid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children Home & Aid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Ronguillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruzeller Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Stamps, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?