Peterson et al v. AbbVie, et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Peterson and Bradley Peterson
Defendant: AbbVie Products LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Does 1-25, Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Pharmacia & UpJohn Company Inc, Pfizer, Besins Healthcare, Inc and AbbVie
Case Number: 1:2019cv00472
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 02:431
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry #12 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly contained an error and is amended as follows: All claims against defendants Pfizer and Pharmacia & Upjohn Company Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: All claims against defendants Pfizer and Pharmacia & Upjohn Company Inc. are dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT Master Short Form Complaint MDL 2545 filed by Barbara Peterson, Bradley Peterson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15496037.(Kaufman, David)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Pfizer, Pharmacia & UpJohn Company Inc by Matthew Aaron Holian (Holian, Matthew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Holian, Matthew)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
January 24, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED from Northern District of Illinois; ( 1:19-cv-00472 Peterson et al v. Pfizer et al / Direct file in ILND). In Re: Testosterone Replacement Therapy Products Liability Litigation (MDL 2545 ). (kp, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIVED from California Southern; Case Number 3:18-cv-02726 (kp)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred to Northern District of Illinois. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of Illinois*.*219 South Dearborn Street**Chicago, IL 60604* (Attachments: #1 MDL No. 2545, CTO-102, #2 Transmittal Letter from Receiving District) (rmc) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/24/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued re Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/24/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint against All Plaintiffs, filed by Bradley Peterson, Barbara Peterson.New Summons Requested. (Kaufman, David) (acc). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/24/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. The new case number is 3:18-cv-02726-AJB-RBB.(no document attached) (jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/24/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/24/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ABBVIE, Does 1-25, Pfizer ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11958015.), filed by Bradley Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2726-BEN-RBB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Kaufman, David)(lrc) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson et al v. AbbVie, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & UpJohn Company Inc
Represented By: Matthew Aaron Holian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer
Represented By: Matthew Aaron Holian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Besins Healthcare, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Peterson
Represented By: David Andrew Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Peterson
Represented By: David Andrew Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?