Johnson v. Village of Tinley Park et al
Plaintiff: Bonnie R Johnson
Defendant: Village of Tinley Park, Patrick Carr, Kevin Workowski, John Urbanski, Denise Maiolo, David J Niemeyer, Cook County, Il and Will County, IL.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00510
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Ruling on Plaintiff's motion to strike certain paragraphs of the "complaint and jury demand"; and, thereafter, to remand case to the Circuit Court of Cook County #18 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo is reset for 5/3/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's motion to strike exhibits as attached to defendants' "motion to dismiss pursuant to 12(b)(6)"; or, in the alternative, motion to convert and stay #15 is taken under advisement. The scheduling conference date of 4/4/2019 is stricken, pending disposition to motion to dismiss. No appearance required on 3/28/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Village of Tinley Parkin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Bonnie R Johnson to remand, MOTION by Plaintiff Bonnie R Johnson to strike Certain Paragraphs of the "Complaint and Jury Demand"; and, thereafter, to Remand Case to the Circuit Court of Cook County. #18 (OConnor, Patrick)
March 4, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiff's motion to remand #18 as follows: Defendants to respond by 3/15/2019. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/28/2019 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance required on 3/6/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
February 27, 2019 MOTION by Plaintiff Bonnie R Johnson to remand case to the Circuit Court of Cook County (Omitted Relief from motion #18 ). (aee, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen E. Eberhardt for presentment of motion to strike #18 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Eberhardt, Stephen)
February 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Bonnie R Johnson to strike Certain Paragraphs of the "Complaint and Jury Demand"; and, thereafter, to Remand Case to the Circuit Court of Cook County. (Eberhardt, Stephen)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY by Bonnie R Johnson to response to motion, #16 to Strike Exhibits Attached to Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) (Eberhardt, Stephen)
February 20, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Patrick Carr, Denise Maiolo, David J Niemeyer, John Urbanski, Village of Tinley Park, Kevin Workowski to MOTION by Plaintiff Bonnie R Johnson to strike Exhibits as attached to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; or, in the alternative, Motion to Convert and Stay. #15 (OConnor, Patrick)
February 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Bonnie R Johnson to strike Exhibits as attached to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; or, in the alternative, Motion to Convert and Stay. (Eberhardt, Stephen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant motion to dismiss pursuant to 12(b)(6) #11 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 3/8/2019. Defendant to reply by 3/22/2019. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 5/3/2019 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance required on 2/15/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Patrick Carr, Denise Maiolo, David J Niemeyer, John Urbanski, Village of Tinley Park, Kevin Workowski(OConnor, Patrick)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Halpin OConnor for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 2/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. (OConnor, Patrick)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Patrick Carr, Denise Maiolo, David J Niemeyer, John Urbanski, Village of Tinley Park, Kevin Workowski Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Section 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(OConnor, Patrick)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 4/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 4/1/2019. The report must comply with the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bonnie R Johnson by Stephen E. Eberhardt (Eberhardt, Stephen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
January 25, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by All Defendants re attorney appearance #5 , attorney appearance #3 , jury demand #4 , civil cover sheet #2 (OConnor, Patrick)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Patrick Carr, Denise Maiolo, David J Niemeyer, John Urbanski, Village of Tinley Park, Kevin Workowski by Michael Russell Hartigan (Hartigan, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 JURY Demand (OConnor, Patrick)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Patrick Carr, Denise Maiolo, David J Niemeyer, John Urbanski, Village of Tinley Park, Kevin Workowski by Patrick Halpin OConnor (OConnor, Patrick)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (OConnor, Patrick)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois County Department Law Division, case number (2018 L 065091) filed by Patrick Carr, Denise Maiolo, David J Niemeyer, John Urbanski, Village of Tinley Park, Kevin Workowski Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15413733. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(OConnor, Patrick)(Document contains incorrect case number) Modified on 1/28/2019 (aee, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Village of Tinley Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie R Johnson
Represented By: Stephen E. Eberhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Tinley Park
Represented By: Patrick Halpin OConnor
Represented By: Michael Russell Hartigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Carr
Represented By: Patrick Halpin OConnor
Represented By: Michael Russell Hartigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Workowski
Represented By: Patrick Halpin OConnor
Represented By: Michael Russell Hartigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Urbanski
Represented By: Patrick Halpin OConnor
Represented By: Michael Russell Hartigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Maiolo
Represented By: Patrick Halpin OConnor
Represented By: Michael Russell Hartigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J Niemeyer
Represented By: Patrick Halpin OConnor
Represented By: Michael Russell Hartigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Il
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will County, IL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?