Gomez et al v. Schwab, Corp et al
Plaintiff: Arthur James Muellman Gomez
Defendant: Garrett Wynne, John and Jane Doe, Charles Schwab, Corp, ReedSmith LLP and Etrade Financial Corp
Case Number: 1:2019cv00540
Filed: January 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by James Terrence Hultquist for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #32 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 4/2/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Hultquist, James)
March 26, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Defendants Etrade Financial Corp, ReedSmith LLP for extension of time to file response/reply as to amended complaint, #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit James T. Hultquist Declaration)(Hultquist, James)
March 26, 2019 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Etrade Financial Corp, ReedSmith LLP by James Terrence Hultquist (Hultquist, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM by Arthur James Muellman Gomez in support of motion to disqualify counsel #29 for ETrade (CoDft ReedSmith) by Ltd Scope Counsel Pro Tem (Gomez, Felipe)
March 25, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION by Plaintiff Arthur James Muellman Gomez to disqualify counsel for ETrade (CoDft ReedSmith) by Ltd Scope Counsel Pro Tem (Gomez, Felipe)
March 25, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED summons returned executed #24 as to ETrade correcting incomplete affidavit (Due Date Remains the Same) (Gomez, Felipe)
March 25, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED summons returned executed #25 as to Schwab correcting incomplete affidavit (Due Date Remains the Same) (Gomez, Felipe)
March 25, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur James Muellman Gomez as to ReedSmith LLP on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Gomez, Felipe)
March 22, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur James Muellman Gomez as to Charles Schwab, Corp on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Gomez, Felipe)
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur James Muellman Gomez as to Etrade Financial Corp on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Gomez, Felipe)
March 20, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The motion presentment date of 3/25/2019 #22 is stricken; parties need not appear. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded that all motions are to be noticed for presentment for a day and time at which the court hears motions. Plaintiff's counsel shall re-notice his motion #20 . Mailed notice (ef, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 22 Arthur James Muellman Gomez's NOTICE of Motion by Felipe N Gomez for presentment of motion to disqualify counsel, #20 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/25/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gomez, Felipe)
March 18, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Arthur James Muellman Gomez in support of motion to disqualify counsel, #20 filed by AJ Gomez's Attorney of Choice (Gomez, Felipe)
March 18, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Arthur James Muellman Gomez to disqualify counsel ReedSmith per 1.7 and 3.7 as Hopelessly Conflcited Counsel of Record By Way of Simultaneously Being Alleged RICO CoConspirators and named CoDefendants with Alleged Perp Client ETrade in 19cv0540 and as Material Witness in 19cv0827 (Pending M/Consolidate with 0540 for further proceedings), filed by AJ Gomez's Attorney of Choice (Gomez, Felipe)
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Felipe Gomez, Esq. regarding declaration #17 755 ILCS 45/2 Certification of ETrade Power of Attorney On Demand by Laura Katalano (Gomez, Felipe)
March 13, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant E*Trade Financial Corp. (acm)
March 13, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ReedSmith LLP, and Charles Schwab Corp. (acm)
March 13, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Garrett Wynne. (acm)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing and ruling on motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to pay filing fee and allow late filing of the first amended complaint #12 is granted. The first amended complaint filed on 3/7/19, will be deemed as timely filed. The Court will reinstate and review plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 and rule accordingly. Status hearing set for 4/10/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Arthur James Muellman Gomez regarding complaint,,, #4 , attorney appearance #3 , affidavit #16 ETrade Demanded Power of Attorney from AJM Gomez to Felipe Gomez, Esq. (PI Redacted) (Gomez, Felipe)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Arthur James Muellman Gomez regarding affidavit #14 Notarized Resubmission of #14 (with preparer identified) (Gomez, Felipe)
March 10, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Felipe Gomez, Esq. regarding affidavit #14 of Arthur JM Gomez (Gomez, Felipe)
March 10, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Arthur James Muellman Gomez regarding attorney appearance #3 , extension of time #12 Verification of Existence and Awareness of Claims/Clarification of Record (Gomez, Felipe)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff AJ Gomez's NOTICE of Motion by Felipe N Gomez for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gomez, Felipe)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Arthur James Muellman Gomez for extension of time to pay fee and to allow Nunc Pro Tunc 45 min late filed FAC (Gomez, Felipe)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Arthur James Muellman Gomez against Charles Schwab, Corp, Garrett Wynne, ReedSmith LLP, Etrade Financial Corp and terminating John and Jane Doe (Various Schwab Employees) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 11 - ETrade Issued xxx2085 Closure Confirmation)(Gomez, Felipe)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is voluntarily withdrawn without prejudice. Plaintiff's amended complaint shall be filed by 3/6/2019. Plaintiff shall also pay the filing fee by 3/6/2019. Status hearing set for 4/10/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Arthur Gomez Amended NOTICE of Motion by Felipe N Gomez for presentment of motion to consolidate cases #6 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gomez, Felipe)
February 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Garrett Wynne (jjr, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 Arthur Gomez's NOTICE of Motion by Felipe N Gomez for presentment of motion to consolidate cases #6 , application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/20/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gomez, Felipe)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Arthur James Muellman Gomez in support of motion to consolidate cases #6 19cv0540 and 19cv0827 (Gomez, Felipe)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Arthur James Muellman Gomez to consolidate cases 19cv0540 and 19cv0827 (Gomez, Felipe)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
January 28, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
January 27, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIVED COMPLAINT Under 18 USC 1964 (RICO) filed by Law Office of Felipe Gomez, Esq., Pro Bono for AJ Gomez, filed by Arthur J.M. Gomez; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 6.19.07. Dr. Gomez Testating Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - Designation of Felipe Gomez as Successor Custodian, #3 Exhibit 3 - Purported Schwab Acct. Opening Forms, #4 Exhibit 4 - Example Misnomered Schwab Statement, #5 Exhibit 5 - 7.14.11 Notice of Death/Authorization Forms, #6 Exhibit 6- 10.30.15 Power of Attorney to V. Prohoda, #7 Exhibit 7 -12.8.17 ReNotice of Custodial Authority/POA, #8 Exhibit 8 - Schwab Misnomered Misaddressed Statements/Comms, #9 Exhibit 9 - E-Mails with Schwab John Doe 1 ReReReRe Verifying and regarding 18 v. 21 Termination Age Issue, #10 Exhibit 10 - Emails with Schwab Jane Doe 1, #11 Exhibit 11 - V. Prihoda Letter of Rep and ReVerification to Def. Wynnr)(Gomez, Felipe) Modified on 1/28/2019 (aee, ).
January 27, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arthur J.M. Gomez by Felipe N Gomez , Esq., Pro Bono (V. Prihoda, Of Counsel) (Gomez, Felipe)
January 27, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Arthur J.M. Gomez for leave to proceed in forma pauperis represented by Pro Bono Counsel Law Office of Felipe Gomez, Esq. (Virginia Prihoda, Of Counsel) (Gomez, Felipe)
January 27, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gomez, Felipe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez et al v. Schwab, Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab, Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReedSmith LLP
Represented By: James Terrence Hultquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etrade Financial Corp
Represented By: James Terrence Hultquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur James Muellman Gomez
Represented By: Felipe N Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?