PNC Bank National Association v. 650 Church Street, LLC

Plaintiff: PNC Bank National Association
Defendant: 650 Church Street, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00602
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew L. Hendricksen for presentment of motion to appoint receiver #13 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/1/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Hendricksen, Matthew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff PNC Bank National Association to appoint receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hendricksen, Matthew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 4/1/2019 at 9:45 a.m. Mr. Chacin appeared and was warned that Corporations may only appear in federal court through a licensed attorney see Rowland v. Cal. Men's Colony, Unit II Men's Advisory Council, 506 U.S. 194, 201-02 (1993). Defendant is given to 4/1/2019 to obtain counsel and file their appearance. Mr. Chacin cautioned that failure obtain licensed counsel by 4/1/2019 and properly litigate this case may result in sanctions up to and including the order of default. Mailed notice (cdh, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by PNC Bank National Association re affidavit of service #10 (Hendricksen, Matthew)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff PNC Bank National Association regarding Complaint & Summons served on 650 Churst St., c/o Secretary of State on February 25, 2019 (Hendricksen, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by PNC Bank National Association re status report #8 Notice of Filing (Hendricksen, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS Report Initial Status Report by PNC Bank National Association (Hendricksen, Matthew)
February 4, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant 650 Church Street, LLC (jjr, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 3/7/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by PNC Bank National Association re complaint #1 (Hendricksen, Matthew)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PNC Bank National Association by Matthew L. Hendricksen (Hendricksen, Matthew)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PNC Bank National Association by Matthew L. Hendricksen James Crowley Appearance (Hendricksen, Matthew)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hendricksen, Matthew)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by PNC Bank National Association; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15428354. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hendricksen, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank National Association v. 650 Church Street, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 650 Church Street, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank National Association
Represented By: Matthew L. Hendricksen
Represented By: James M. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?