Admiral Insurance Company as subrogee of The Brownstone Condominium Association v. NIBCO, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Admiral Insurance Company as subrogee of The Brownstone Condominium Association
Defendant: NIBCO, Inc., FETTES LOVE & SIEBEN, INC and Fettes, Love & Sieben, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00670
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Fettes, Love & Sieben, Inc.. (Klocke, Joseph)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Admiral Insurance Company as subrogee of The Brownstone Condominium Association. (Ostojic, Bozidar)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fettes, Love & Sieben, Inc. by Joseph J. Klocke (Klocke, Joseph)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses by NIBCO, Inc.(Hayes, Thomas)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Fettes, Love & Sieben, Inc.(Seiber, Andrew)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 2/14/2019. Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted. Answer to be filed by 2/28/2019. MIDP disclosures to be submitted by 4/1/2019. Status hearing is set for 4/15/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Admiral Insurance Company as subrogee of The Brownstone Condominium Association by Bozidar Robert Ostojic (Ostojic, Bozidar)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Charles Seiber for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/14/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Seiber, Andrew)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Fettes, Love & Sieben, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal, #2 (Seiber, Andrew)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fettes, Love & Sieben, Inc. by Andrew Charles Seiber (Seiber, Andrew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, )
February 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant NIBCO, Inc. by Thomas J Hayes (Hayes, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court, case number (2018 L 013638) filed by NIBCO, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15436496. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons, #2 Exhibit B Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Statement of Loss)(Hayes, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hayes, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Admiral Insurance Company as subrogee of The Brownstone Condominium Association v. NIBCO, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIBCO, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FETTES LOVE & SIEBEN, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fettes, Love & Sieben, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Charles Seiber
Represented By: Joseph J. Klocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Admiral Insurance Company as subrogee of The Brownstone Condominium Association
Represented By: Bozidar Robert Ostojic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?