Ryzak v. Shoreline Marine Company
Plaintiff: Paul Ryzak
Defendant: Shoreline Marine Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00671
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Paul Ryzak Mandatory Initial Disclosures (O'bryan, Sean)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service Defendant Shoreline Marine Company Mandatory Initial Disclosures (Friedman, Shari)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paul Ryzak by Sean Joseph O'bryan (O'bryan, Sean)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Plaintiff shall comply with Local Rule 83.15 by 4/1/2019. MIDP disclosures shall be served by 3/18/2019. Written discovery requests shall be served by 4/30/2019. Fact discovery shall close 8/30/2019. Plaintiff shall serve his Rule 26(a)(2) disclosure(s) by 9/30/2019. Plaintiff's expert(s) shall be deposed by 11/15/2019. Defendant shall serve its Rule 26(a)(2) disclosure(s) by 12/16/2019. Defendant's expert(s) shall be deposed by 1/31/2020. The deadline for moving to amend the pleadings or add new parties is 7/26/2019. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 2/28/2020. The status hearing set for 3/7/2019 #4 is stricken and re-set for 4/10/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS Report by Shoreline Marine Company (Friedman, Shari)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shoreline Marine Company by Shari L. Friedman (Friedman, Shari)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to amended complaint and affirmative defense by Shoreline Marine Company(Minichello, Dennis)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shoreline Marine Company by Dennis Minichello (Minichello, Dennis)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED complaint by Paul Ryzak against Shoreline Marine Company (O'Bryan, Dennis)
February 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Shoreline Marine Company (jn, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (O'Bryan, Dennis)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 3/7/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
February 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paul Ryzak by Dennis M. O'Bryan (O'Bryan, Dennis)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Paul Ryzak; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15436542.(O'Bryan, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryzak v. Shoreline Marine Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Ryzak
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan
Represented By: Sean Joseph O'bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoreline Marine Company
Represented By: Shari L. Friedman
Represented By: Dennis Minichello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?