Great Northern Insurance Company v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc. and Shenzhen Double King Technology Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00684
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 22 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Great Northern Insurance Company (Heilman, Jonathan)
March 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Amazon.Com, Inc. re reply #20 (Sample, John)
March 20, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc. (Sample, John)
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc. by W. Brendan Murphy (Murphy, W.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 Mandatory Initial Discovery Disclosures by Great Northern Insurance Company (Heilman, Jonathan)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service (Heilman, Jonathan)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Amazon.Com, Inc. re other #15 (Sample, John)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 Amended Mandatory Initial Discovery Disclosures by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Sample, John)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Amazon.Com, Inc. re other #13 (Sample, John)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 Mandatory Initial Discovery Disclosures by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Sample, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Great Northern Insurance Company to MOTION by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc. to dismiss Partial Motion to DIsmiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Heilman, Jonathan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to dismiss #9 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss by 3/6/2019; Defendant Amazon's reply due by 3/20/2019. Motion hearing set for 2/14/2019 #10 is stricken. Unless excused by the MIDP Standing Order, MIDP disclosures shall be served by 3/8/2019. The status hearing set for 3/12/2019 #6 is stricken and re-set for 4/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 3/28/2019. The status report shall address the status of service on Defendant Shenzhen Double King Technology Co., Ltd.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by John Barkley Sample, Iv for presentment of motion to dismiss #9 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Sample, John)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc. to dismiss Partial Motion to DIsmiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Sample, John)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amazon.Com, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sample, John)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law by Amazon.Com, Inc.(Sample, John)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 3/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to all counsel of record. (smm, )
February 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc. by John Barkley Sample, Iv (Sample, John)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sample, John)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Lake County, case number (2018 L 864) filed by Amazon.Com, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15438500. (Sample, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: John Barkley Sample, Iv
Represented By: W. Brendan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Double King Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?