Cole v. Phillippo et al
Plaintiff: Keyon A. Cole
Defendant: J. Matena, Officer Phillippo, M. Jones, R. Rivera, E. Velez and E. Green
Amicus Curiae: Service List
Case Number: 1:2019cv00752
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Keyon A. Cole for appointment of counsel. (Envelope Postmark date 2/27/19).(gcy, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Keyon A. Cole for enlargement of time to file USM-285 forms for each defendant. (Envelope Postmark date 2/21/19). (gcy, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Keyon A. Cole re received usm-285 form 6 . (Envelope Postmark date 2/21/19). (gcy, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Correction #3 . (gcy, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Keyon A. Cole for attorney assistance. (gcy, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Keyon A. Cole for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (Exhibits).(gcy, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/13/2019) (gcy, ).
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 4 copies by Keyon A. Cole. (Envelope Postmark date 2/1/19. (gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Phillippo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Matena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Phillippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Service List
Represented By: Prisoner Correspondence 5 - Internal Use Only
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyon A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?