Banister v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Delois A. Banister
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A. and J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00793
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 MAILED two blank USM-285 forms to plaintiff (las, )
March 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued, certified copy of order dated 3/18/2019 to the US Marshal's Office as to Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A. via email. (las, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 COMPLAINT filed by Delois A. Banister; (las, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of financial indigency, Plaintiff's motion #4 to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The motion #5 for attorney representation is denied for now and without prejudice. Plaintiff lists only one firm that she has contacted about retaining for a fee. She must contact at least three law firms, legal clinics, or legal services organizations to ask about pro bono representation (that is, for no charge). Also, Plaintiff is a college graduate and this case is in the initial stages, so she might be able to competently represent herself; more litigation is required before deciding that issue with confidence. Defendant U.S. Bank's extension motion #10 is terminated as unnecessary: there is no answer deadline yet. The Marshals Service is appointed to serve the Defendants, and the Clerk's Office shall issue summons as to the Defendants. Also, the Clerk's Office shall mail two blank USM-285 forms to Plaintiff, who shall complete and return them to the Marshals Service by 04/08/2019. These forms are required before the Marshals Service will attempt service. The Court notes that, after service of process, the parties must address whether there is subject matter jurisdiction if Plaintiff is challenging a judgment entered in state court. See Rooker v. Fidelity Trust Co., 263 U.S. 413 (1923); District of Columbia Court of Appeals v. Feldman, 460 U.S. 462 (1983); Johnson v. Orr, 551 F.3d 564, 567 (7th Cir. 2008). A status hearing is set for 04/22/2019 at 10:00 AM.Emailed notice (slb, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A. by Jonathan Daniel Nusgart (Nusgart, Jonathan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Craig C. Smith for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/20/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Smith, Craig)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A. for extension of time to file answer regarding received complaint #1 or otherwise plead (Smith, Craig)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A. by Craig C. Smith (Smith, Craig)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Delois A. Banister for attorney representation. (jh, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Delois A. Banister for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Delois A. Banister. (jh, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 2 copies by Delois A. Banister. (jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banister v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delois A. Banister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Craig C. Smith
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Nusgart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?