United States of America v. Cornelious et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES of AMERICA on behalf of its agency SECRETARY of U.S. DEPARTMENT of HOUSING and URBAN DEVELOPMENT and United States of America
Defendant: HUBERT CORNELIOUS, DONATUS CORNELIOUS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS and RAVYN CORNELIOUS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00795
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS Report by United States of America (Rasmussen, Ashley)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to All Unknown Occupants on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Donatus Cornelious on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Ravyn Cornelious on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Hubert Cornelious on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 13, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant All Unknown Occupants. (acm)
March 13, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Donatus Cornelious, Hubert Cornelious, and Ravyn Cornelious. (acm)
February 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant All Unknown Occupants (pk, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The motion presentment date of 2/19/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff's motion for order directing Clerk to issue summons #5 is granted. It is hereby ordered that the Clerk of Court shall issue a summons in the above- captioned matter as to All Unknown Occupants. Initial status hearing set for 4/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff United States of America regarding MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for order Directing Clerk to Issue Summons #5 , notice of motion #6 (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Ashley Kaye Rasmussen for presentment of motion for order #5 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for order Directing Clerk to Issue Summons (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
February 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff UNITED STATES of AMERICA on behalf of its agency SECRETARY of U.S. DEPARTMENT of HOUSING and URBAN DEVELOPMENT by Ashley Kaye Rasmussen (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by UNITED STATES of AMERICA on behalf of its agency SECRETARY of U.S. DEPARTMENT of HOUSING and URBAN DEVELOPMENT; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed, #2 Exhibit Order, #3 Exhibit Notice and Proof)(Rasmussen, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cornelious et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUBERT CORNELIOUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONATUS CORNELIOUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAVYN CORNELIOUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES of AMERICA on behalf of its agency SECRETARY of U.S. DEPARTMENT of HOUSING and URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: Ashley Kaye Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Ashley Kaye Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?