Gilbert v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Michael Gilbert
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00804
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company by Sarah-Joel Martine Privert (Privert, Sarah-Joel)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 Union Pacific Railroad Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Union Pacific Railroad Company(Dawson, Brody)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company by Brody Elizabeth Dawson (Dawson, Brody)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure STATEMENT by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Hayden, Thomas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company by Thomas A. P. Hayden (Hayden, Thomas)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: MIDP disclosures shall be served by 5/9/2019. The status hearing set for 3/11/2019 #5 is stricken and re-set for 5/29/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 5/22/2019. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Gilbert. Union Pacific Railroad Company waiver sent on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Gunzburg, Michael)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 3/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
February 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Gilbert by Michael B. Gunzburg (Gunzburg, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gunzburg, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Gilbert; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15461864.(Gunzburg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Brody Elizabeth Dawson
Represented By: Thomas A. P. Hayden
Represented By: Sarah-Joel Martine Privert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gilbert
Represented By: Michael B. Gunzburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?