Seidler et al v. United Maintenance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Will Binns and Michael Seidler
Defendant: United Maintenance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00813
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Maintenance Company, Inc. by Emory Darnell Moore, Jr (Moore, Emory)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the certification in R. 9, the joint extension motion #9 on MID disclosures is granted to 05/03/2019. The initial status hearing of 04/03/2019 is reset to 05/07/2019 at 10:30 a.m., with the joint initial status report, R. 5, due by 05/01/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 Joint NOTICE of Motion by Joseph Kevin Mulherin for presentment of extension of time #9 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/28/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Mulherin, Joseph)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant United Maintenance Company, Inc. for extension of time JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND MANDATORY INITIAL DISCOVERY DEADLINES (Mulherin, Joseph)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Class Action and Collective Action ANSWER to Complaint by United Maintenance Company, Inc.(Mulherin, Joseph)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United Maintenance Company, Inc. (Mulherin, Joseph)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Maintenance Company, Inc. by Joseph Kevin Mulherin (Mulherin, Joseph)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 04/03/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
February 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant United Maintenance Company, Inc. (pj, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
February 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Will Binns, Michael Seidler by Jeffrey Grant Brown (Brown, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Dunn, Glen)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Seidler, Will Binns; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15463401.(Dunn, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seidler et al v. United Maintenance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will Binns
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Seidler
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Brown
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Maintenance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Emory Darnell Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Kevin Mulherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?