United States of America v. Schulze et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kathleen Schulze and Michael Schulze
Case Number: 1:2019cv00816
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's motion for entry of default #8 is denied without prejudice. Motion hearing held on 4/2/2019. Defendants are to answer or otherwise plead by 4/23/2019. Status hearing set for 5/1/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Bradley Alexander Sarnell for presentment of motion for entry of default #8 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/2/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Sarnell, Bradley)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kathleen Schulze, Michael Schulze by Gregg Martin Rzepczynski (Rzepczynski, Gregg)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for entry of default Against Defendants Michael Schulze and Kathleen Schulze (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Request for Default)(Sarnell, Bradley)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Status Report due by 4/15/2019. Status hearing set for 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/15/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Michael Schulze on 2/16/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Sarnell, Bradley)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Kathleen Schulze on 2/16/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Sarnell, Bradley)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
February 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kathleen Schulze, Michael Schulze (pj, )
February 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Bradley Alexander Sarnell (Sarnell, Bradley)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sarnell, Bradley)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Sarnell, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Schulze et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Schulze
Represented By: Gregg Martin Rzepczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schulze
Represented By: Gregg Martin Rzepczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bradley Alexander Sarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?