Neubauer-Perkins, Inc. et al v. Jason Walters & Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Neubauer-Perkins, Inc. and Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Defendant: Jason Walters, Matthew French, Jason Walters & Associates, LLC, Zimmer US, Inc. d/b/a Zimmer Biomet; CPD Distribution, LLC d/b/a ZB Great Lakes, CPD Distribution, LLC and Zimmer US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00821
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 4/12/2019 is stricken and reset to 4/22/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are reminded that responsive pleadings must comply with section A(3) of this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. Status hearing set for 4/12/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. In the event that the defendant files a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), the defendant is granted leave to notice that motion for presentment at the date and time of the status hearing. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants CPD Distribution, LLC, Zimmer US, Inc. (jjr, )
February 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Matthew French, Jason Walters & Associates, LLC, Jason Walters (jjr, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (yap, )
February 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Neubauer-Perkins, Inc., Smith & Nephew, Inc. by David K. Haase (Haase, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Haase, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Neubauer-Perkins, Inc., Smith & Nephew, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15464712. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haase, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neubauer-Perkins, Inc. et al v. Jason Walters & Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Walters & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc. d/b/a Zimmer Biomet; CPD Distribution, LLC d/b/a ZB Great Lakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPD Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neubauer-Perkins, Inc.
Represented By: David K. Haase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: David K. Haase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?