Stamps v. Amtrak

Plaintiff: Darlene Stamps
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak, National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Amtrak
Case Number: 1:2019cv00914
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Cooke, Kristen)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service of Plaintiff's Mandatory Disclosures by William John McMahon on behalf of Darlene Stamps (McMahon, William)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held and continued to 6/11/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mandatory initial disclosures are due 4/7/2019. Fact discovery (including treaters) to be completed by 11/29/2019. Parties may submit their agreed proposed confidentiality order to Proposed_Order_Shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. If the parties jointly wish to have a settlement conference, they shall contact the Court's Courtroom Deputy for a referral to Magistrate Judge Weisman. Mailed notice (cdh, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Darlene Stamps (McMahon, William)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 3/28/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darlene Stamps as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (McMahon, William) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office) (ew, ).
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Cooke, Kristen)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Railroad Passenger Corporation(Cooke, Kristen)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation by Kristen Anne Cooke (Cooke, Kristen)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation by Kevin V. Boyle (Boyle, Kevin)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
February 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (jjr, )
February 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darlene Stamps by William John McMahon (McMahon, William)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Darlene Stamps; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15482963. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McMahon, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stamps v. Amtrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Stamps
Represented By: William John McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Kristen Anne Cooke
Represented By: Kevin V. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrak
Represented By: Kristen Anne Cooke
Represented By: Kevin V. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?