Elfers v. Gonzalez et al

Plaintiff: Mark Elfers
Defendant: Richard A. Gonzalez, Brett J. Hart, Edward M. Liddy, William J. Chase, Glenn F. Tilton, Frederick H. Waddell, Melody B. Meyer, Edward J. Rapp, Roxanne S. Austin, Robert J. Alpern, William H.L. Burnside and Abbvie, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00934
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #15 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15698708. (McKenna, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: This case having reassigned to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras for all further proceedings, the 4/11/19 motion hearing before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber is vacated. Mailed notice(maf)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras for all further proceedings for Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/1/2019. (lf, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 5/29/19 is vacated. The Court will hear the motion to dismiss on 4/11/19 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 5/29/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Z Rabinovitz for presentment of motion to dismiss, #8 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/11/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rabinovitz, Joshua)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Abbvie, Inc., Robert J. Alpern, Roxanne S. Austin, William H.L. Burnside, William J. Chase, Richard A. Gonzalez, Brett J. Hart, Edward M. Liddy, Melody B. Meyer, Edward J. Rapp, Glenn F. Tilton, Frederick H. Waddell in support of motion to dismiss, #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Rabinovitz, Joshua)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Edward J. Rapp, Brett J. Hart, Roxanne S. Austin, Melody B. Meyer, Frederick H. Waddell, Richard A. Gonzalez, William J. Chase, Glenn F. Tilton, Robert J. Alpern, Abbvie, Inc., William H.L. Burnside, Edward M. Liddy to dismiss (Rabinovitz, Joshua)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Abbvie, Inc. (Rabinovitz, Joshua)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbvie, Inc., Robert J. Alpern, Roxanne S. Austin, William H.L. Burnside, William J. Chase, Richard A. Gonzalez, Brett J. Hart, Edward M. Liddy, Melody B. Meyer, Edward J. Rapp, Glenn F. Tilton, Frederick H. Waddell by Joshua Z Rabinovitz (Rabinovitz, Joshua)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark Elfers. All Defendants. (Carroll, Katrina)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Elfers by Kyle Alan Shamberg (Shamberg, Kyle)
February 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Elfers by Katrina Carroll (Carroll, Katrina)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Carroll, Katrina)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mark Elfers; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15485351.(Carroll, Katrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elfers v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett J. Hart
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M. Liddy
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Chase
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn F. Tilton
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick H. Waddell
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody B. Meyer
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Rapp
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne S. Austin
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Alpern
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H.L. Burnside
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Elfers
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Thomas J. McKenna
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?