International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO v. K-Com Transport Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO
Defendant: K-Com Transport Services, Inc. d/b/a K-Com Environmental and K-Com Transport Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00935
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Brad H Russell for presentment of motion for default judgment #9 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/18/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Russell, Brad)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO for default judgment as to Defendant K-Com Transport Services, Inc. d/b/a K-Com Environmental (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Russell, Brad)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS Report Plaintiff's Initial by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO (Russell, Brad)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 3/28/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 3/18/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO (Russell, Brad)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO as to K-Com Transport Services, Inc. on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Russell, Brad)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Dale D. Pierson (Pierson, Dale)
February 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant K-Com Transport Services, Inc. d/b/a K-Com Environmental (jjr, )
February 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Russell, Brad)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Brad H Russell (Russell, Brad)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15486076. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B)(Russell, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO v. K-Com Transport Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Dale D. Pierson
Represented By: Brad H Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Com Transport Services, Inc. d/b/a K-Com Environmental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Com Transport Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?