Armanov v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Lula Armanov
Defendant: Acting Comm. of SSA Nancy Berryhill and Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00937
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Referring Judge: Sheila M Finnegan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT filed by Lula Armanov. (tt, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review is due within 60 days of the filing of the administrative record (no motion required). The Social Security Administration's motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support are due 45 days after plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after defendant's brief is filed. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week before the due date and upon good cause shown.Mailed notice (sxw, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. This action (1) is neither frivolous nor malicious; (2) states a claim on which relief may be granted; and (3) seeks damages against a defendant who is not immune from such relief. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)-(iii). See also Manning v. Arizona, No. 12 C 1019, 2012 WL 1161506, at *1 (N.D. Ill. Apr. 9, 2012). In addition, the facts set forth in Plaintiff's affidavit demonstrate that Plaintiff has met the burden of establishing indigence.Mailed notice (sxw, )
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Judge Robert M. Dow, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 4/1/19. (tt, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Good, Neil)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Douglas G. Snodgrass as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Nancy Berryhill (Snodgrass, Douglas)
February 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Good, Neil)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lula Armanov by Neil H. Good (Good, Neil)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Lula Armanov for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Good, Neil)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT for Administrative Review filed by Lula Armanov; (Good, Neil) Modified on 2/15/2019 (tt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armanov v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Comm. of SSA Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Douglas G. Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Armanov
Represented By: Neil H. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?