Pledger v. National Collegiate Athletic Association et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Pledger
Defendant: Virginia Union University and National Collegiate Athletic Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv01010
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua Pledger. National Collegiate Athletic Association waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Cases)(Logan, Todd)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of Record. (jjr, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED from Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00331 (jjr)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, IN RE: MDL 2492 on February 15, 2019. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 2/20/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois IN RE: MDL 2492 IN RE: National Collegiate Athletic Association Student-Athlete Concussion Injury Litigation Certified Transfer Order #18. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 2/20/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 2/20/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 2/20/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, VIRGINIA UNION UNIVERSITY. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 2/20/2019.]
January 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Raizner on behalf of Plaintiff JOSHUA PLEDGER. (Raizner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 2/20/2019.]
January 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOSHUA PLEDGER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5254698) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Raizner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 2/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pledger v. National Collegiate Athletic Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Union University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Pledger
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis Raizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?